Ortiz v. Bower et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Raymond Ortiz
Defendant: Scott D. Wilson, Randall Bower, Phillip Schening, Jr., Cheral Gassman, Anthony J. Mignano, Michael Christopher and Christopher Caufield
Case Number: 1:2019cv01511
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 10 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. #6 Order, #7 judgment, blank in forma pauperis form and authorization form sent to Kenneth Raymond Ortiz. (KM)
December 16, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Reopen Case by Kenneth Raymond Ortiz. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(KM)
December 16, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kenneth Raymond Ortiz.(KM)
December 5, 2019 Remark: Plaintiff mailed #6 Order, #7 judgment, blank in forma pauperis form and the authorization form. (KM)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 JUDGMENT in favor of Anthony J. Mignano, Cheral Gassman, Christopher Caufield, Michael Christopher, Phillip Schening, Jr, Randall Bower, Scott D. Wilson against Kenneth Raymond Ortiz. Signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court on 12/5/2019. (KM)
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court shall administratively terminate this action without filing the complaint or assessing a filing fee. If Ortiz wishes to reopen this action, he shall notify this Court in writing, no later than 30 days from the date of this order. This writing must include either a motion to proceed in forma pauperis along with the required certification of Ortiz's inmate trust fund account and authorization form, or the $350.00 fee. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 12/4/2019. (KM)
November 27, 2019 Remark: Address changed from Genesee County Jail, P.O. Box 151, Batavia, NY 14021-0151 to 11917 Ridge Road, Medina, NY 14103-9201. (KM)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 Letter for address change from Kenneth Raymond Ortiz, dated 11/27/2019, to Dear Maam. (KM)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 Letter from Kenneth Raymond Ortiz, dated 11/19/2019, to Mrs. Loewenguth. (KM)
November 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kenneth Raymond Ortiz.(KM)
November 14, 2019 Remark: Plaintiff mailed a copy of the Pro Se Guidelines as requested. (KM)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 Letter to update address from Kenneth Raymond Ortiz, dated 11/11/2019, to Mrs. Loewenguth. (KM)
November 7, 2019 Remark: Plaintiff has been mailed a pro se packet including a privacy notice, consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge, and a civil case timeline. (CGJ)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Kenneth Raymond Ortiz.(CGJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortiz v. Bower et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott D. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randall Bower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phillip Schening, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cheral Gassman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony J. Mignano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Christopher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Caufield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Raymond Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?