Mejia v. Doe et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Manuel Mejia
Defendant: Jhon Doe and R. Bell
Case Number: 1:2019cv01548
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carlos Manuel Mejia.(SG)
November 20, 2019 E-Filing Notification: #3 JUDGMENT modified on 11/20/19 to attached correct document. (SG)
November 20, 2019 Plaintiff mailed final order, judgment and appeal packet. (SG)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 JUDGMENT in favor of Jhon Doe, R. Bell against Carlos Manuel Mejia. Signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court on 11/20/19. (SG) (Main Document 3 replaced on 11/20/2019) (SG).
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER case shall be administratively terminated; plaintiff shall notify the Court in writing no later than 30 days from the date of this order if he wishes to reopen the action and shall include either a properly supported motion to proceed in forma pauperis that includes a completed and signed Prison Certification and an authorization form or the $350.00 filing fee and $50.00 administrative fee; upon receipt of the motion or the filing fee, the Clerk of Court shall re-open the case. Signed by Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford on 11/19/19. (SG)
November 15, 2019 Remark: Plaintiff has been mailed a pro se packet including a privacy notice, consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge, and a civil case timeline. (CGJ)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Carlos Manuel Mejia.(CGJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mejia v. Doe et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Manuel Mejia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jhon Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?