Peerless Insurance Company v. A.O. Smith Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Peerless Insurance Company
Defendant: A.O. Smith Corporation, Nutone, Inc., Regal Beloit Corporation and Broan-Nutone, LLC
Consolidated Defendant: AO Smith Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv01699
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey Crawford
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Substitution of Counsel: Robert G. Scumaci is substituted for Dennis A. First. CLERK TO FOLLOW UP (Scumaci, Robert)
February 10, 2020 Upon consolidation 19cv1696 Peerless Insurance Company v. Broan-Nutone, LLC et al has been closed, all further docketing shall be entered in 19cv1699 Peerless Insurance Company v. A.O. Smith Corporation et al. (SG)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in support of #8 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Time extended to February 21, 2020. Signed by Hon. Geoffrey Crawford on 2/5/2020. (JL)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
February 5, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply in support of Defendants' motion to dismiss [Dkt. 8] by A.O. Smith Corporation, Regal Beloit Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Scumaci, Robert)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Signed by Hon. Geoffrey Crawford on 2/4/20. (JL)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
January 31, 2020 Filing 11 AFFIRMATION re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Peerless Insurance Company In opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Peerless Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Memorandum in Support, #12 Text of Proposed Order, #13 Certificate of Service)(Smith, Kevin)
January 31, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Consolidate Cases (19-cv-1696 and 19-cv-1699) by A.O. Smith Corporation, Regal Beloit Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D - proposed Order, #6 Memorandum in Support)(Scumaci, Robert)
January 21, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction for Extension to Respond by Peerless Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Smith, Kevin)
January 10, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by A.O. Smith Corporation, Regal Beloit Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration of Wendy Grant, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Scott Scarpelli, #5 Memorandum in Support)(Scumaci, Robert)
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer. A.O. Smith Corporation answer due 1/10/2020. Signed by Hon. Geoffrey Crawford on 1/8/20. (JL)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Peerless Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Insurance Holdings Inc., Corporate Parent Peerless Insurance Company for Peerless Insurance Company.. (Smith, Kevin)
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise appear by A.O. Smith Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in support of motion, #2 Exhibit summons and complaint)(Scumaci, Robert)
December 26, 2019 E-Filing Notification regarding #4 Letter filed by A.O. Smith Corporation: The assigned judge does not accept letters. Parties asking for any type of relief from the court are directed to file formal motions. (KLH)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 Letter filed by A.O. Smith Corporation as to Nutone, Inc., A.O. Smith Corporation, Broan-Nutone, LLC, Regal Beloit Corporation LETTER ON BEHALF OF A.O. SMITH, ONLY. (Scumaci, Robert)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE APPEAR by A.O. Smith Corporation. (Scumaci, Robert)
December 23, 2019 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(CGJ)
December 23, 2019 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by A.O. Smith Corporation. (Scumaci, Robert)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by A.O. Smith Corporation, Peerless Insurance Company PEERLESS NOT THE FILER from Chautauqua Supreme Court, case number EK12019001754. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3688342), filed by A.O. Smith Corporation, Peerless Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Scumaci, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peerless Insurance Company v. A.O. Smith Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.O. Smith Corporation
Represented By: Robert G. Scumaci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nutone, Inc.
Represented By: Brian P. Krzykowski
Represented By: Dennis A. First
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regal Beloit Corporation
Represented By: Robert G. Scumaci
Represented By: Brian P. Krzykowski
Represented By: Dennis A. First
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broan-Nutone, LLC
Represented By: Brian P. Krzykowski
Represented By: Dennis A. First
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peerless Insurance Company
Represented By: Kevin Patrick Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consolidated defendant: AO Smith Corporation
Represented By: Robert G. Scumaci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?