In Re: Fisher-Price Rock 'n Play Sleeper Marketing, Sales Practices, and Products Liability Litigation
Plaintiff: Jessie Poppe, Emily Barton, Candace Kimmel, Samantha Drover-Mundy, Samantha Jacoby, Mark Nabong, Joshua Nadel, Katharine Shaffer, Luke Cuddy, Zachary Mundy, Daniel Pasternacki, Cassandra Mulvey, Josie Willis, Karen Flores, Megan Fieker, Rebecca Drover, Nancy Hanson, Renee Wray, Linda Black, Kerry Mandley, Melanie Nilius Nowlin, Emily Simmonds, Jena Huey, Elizabeth Alfaro, Megan Kaden and Brianna Persons
Defendant: Fisher-Price, Inc. and Mattel, Inc.
In Re: Fisher-Price Rock 'n Play Sleeper Marketing, Sales Practices, and Products Liability Litigation
Intervenor: Katherine Shaffer
Case Number: 1:2019md02903
Filed: August 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey Crawford
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 2/10/2020, before Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. Court Reporter/Transcriber Christi A. Macri, Contact Info christimacri50@gmail.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER.. Redaction Request due 3/5/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/16/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/13/2020. (CM)
February 11, 2020 Filing 43 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Rebecca Drover, Samantha Drover-Mundy, Zachary Mundy.Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00512-GWC et al.(Darr, Kristin)
February 10, 2020 Filing 44 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Geoffrey Crawford: Status Conference held on 2/10/2020. The Court will issue an order scheduling the next Status Conference. Appearances: Christi Macri, Court Reporter. For the defendants: Craig de Recat, Esq., and Adrianne Marshack, Esq., for the plaintiffs: Demet Basar, Esq., Terrence M. Connors, Esq., and Daniel Tepper, Esq. (Court Reporter Christi Macri.) Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al. (BK)
February 7, 2020 E-Filing Notification: Clerk revised docket text to "JOINT STATUS REPORT" to clarify the filing event in all cases: (34 in 1:19-cv-00870-GWC, 50 in 1:19-cv-00787-GWC, 44 in 1:19-cv-01075-GWC, 40 in 1:19-cv-01107-GWC, 48 in 1:19-cv-01076-GWC, 60 in 1:19-cv-00518-GWC, 57 in 1:19-cv-00670-GWC, 39 in 1:19-md-02903-GWC, 38 in 1:19-cv-00941-GWC, 54 in 1:19-cv-00668-GWC, 58 in 1:19-cv-00695-GWC, 66 in 1:19-cv-00512-GWC, 56 in 1:19-cv-00667-GWC, 39 in 1:19-cv-01067-GWC, 36 in 1:19-cv-00791-GWC, 60 in 1:19-cv-01083-GWC, 36 in 1:19-cv-01087-GWC). Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00512-GWC et al. (JHF)
February 6, 2020 Filing 42 RESPONSE in Opposition re (43 in 1:19-cv-01075-GWC, 47 in 1:19-cv-01076-GWC, 38 in 1:19-md-02903-GWC, 39 in 1:19-cv-01107-GWC, 57 in 1:19-cv-00695-GWC, 59 in 1:19-cv-00518-GWC, 37 in 1:19-cv-00941-GWC, 33 in 1:19-cv-00870-GWC, 49 in 1:19-cv-00787-GWC, 38 in 1:19-cv-01067-GWC, 55 in 1:19-cv-00667-GWC, 53 in 1:19-cv-00668-GWC, 59 in 1:19-cv-01083-GWC, 35 in 1:19-cv-01087-GWC, 35 in 1:19-cv-00791-GWC, 56 in 1:19-cv-00670-GWC, 65 in 1:19-cv-00512-GWC) MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Production of Documents in Response to Defendants' First Set of Consolidated Requests for Production of Documents filed by Elizabeth Alfaro, Emily Barton, Linda Black, Luke Cuddy, Rebecca Drover, Megan Fieker, Karen Flores, Nancy Hanson, Jena Huey, Samantha Jacoby, Megan Kaden, Candace Kimmel, Kerry Mandley, Cassandra Mulvey, Zachary Mundy, Joshua Nadel, Melanie Nilius Nowlin, Daniel Pasternacki, Brianna Persons, Jessie Poppe, Katharine Shaffer, Emily Simmonds, Josie Willis, Renee Wray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al.(Connors, Terrence)
February 5, 2020 Filing 41 Letter filed by Fisher-Price, Inc., Fisher Price, Inc., Mattel, Inc., Fisher-Price, Inc. as to Fisher-Price, Inc., Fisher Price, Inc., Mattel, Inc., Fisher-Price, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. apprising Court of Defendants' positions on matters listed in February 5, 2020 Joint Status Report. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al.(Marshack, Adrianne)
February 5, 2020 Filing 40 Letter filed by Elizabeth Alfaro, Emily Barton, Linda Black, Luke Cuddy, Rebecca Drover, Megan Fieker, Karen Flores, Nancy Hanson, Jena Huey, Samantha Jacoby, Megan Kaden, Candace Kimmel, Kerry Mandley, Cassandra Mulvey, Joshua Nadel, Melanie Nilius Nowlin, Daniel Pasternacki, Brianna Persons, Jessie Poppe, Katharine Shaffer, Emily Simmonds, Josie Willis, Renee Wray, Renee Wray as to Fisher-Price, Inc., Fisher Price, Inc., Mattel, Inc., Fisher-Price, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. apprising Court of Plaintiffs' positions on matters to be addressed at the February 10 Conference. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1.22.20 Defendants to Plaintiffs re: Search Terms, #2 Exhibit 1.23.20 Atty Tepper to Defendants re: Search Terms, #3 Exhibit 01.16.20 Defendant Interrogatories, #4 Exhibit 01.31.20 Defendant Amended Interrogatores Responses, #5 Exhibit 01.17.20 Plaintiff Second Document Demand, #6 Exhibit Overton Discovery Order, #7 Exhibit 01.14.20 Meet and Confer Letter to Tepper)Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al.(Connors, Terrence)
February 5, 2020 Filing 39 JOINT STATUS REPORT Concerning Existence of Disputes To Be Addressed at Status Conference by Elizabeth Alfaro, Emily Barton, Linda Black, Luke Cuddy, Rebecca Drover, Megan Fieker, Karen Flores, Nancy Hanson, Jena Huey, Samantha Jacoby, Megan Kaden, Candace Kimmel, Kerry Mandley, Cassandra Mulvey, Joshua Nadel, Melanie Nilius Nowlin, Daniel Pasternacki, Brianna Persons, Jessie Poppe, Katharine Shaffer, Emily Simmonds, Josie Willis, Renee Wray, Renee Wray. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al.(Connors, Terrence) Modified on 2/7/2020 (JHF).
February 3, 2020 Filing 38 MOTION to Compel Plaintiffs' Production of Documents in Response to Defendants' First Set of Consolidated Requests for Production of Documents by Fisher-Price, Inc., Fisher-Price, Inc., Mattel, Inc., Fisher Price, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al.(Marshack, Adrianne)
January 24, 2020 Filing 37 RESPONSE in Opposition re (45 in 1:19-cv-01076-GWC, 57 in 1:19-cv-00518-GWC, 37 in 1:19-cv-01107-GWC, 36 in 1:19-md-02903-GWC, 54 in 1:19-cv-00670-GWC, 47 in 1:19-cv-00787-GWC, 33 in 1:19-cv-01087-GWC, 31 in 1:19-cv-00870-GWC, 36 in 1:19-cv-01067-GWC, 33 in 1:19-cv-00791-GWC, 63 in 1:19-cv-00512-GWC, 41 in 1:19-cv-01075-GWC, 51 in 1:19-cv-00668-GWC, 35 in 1:19-cv-00941-GWC, 57 in 1:19-cv-01083-GWC, 55 in 1:19-cv-00695-GWC, 53 in 1:19-cv-00667-GWC) MOTION for Discovery First Expedited Discovery Motion filed by Fisher-Price, Inc., Fisher-Price, Inc., Mattel, Inc., Fisher Price, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al.(Marshack, Adrianne)
January 21, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION for Discovery First Expedited Discovery Motion by Elizabeth Alfaro, Emily Barton, Linda Black, Luke Cuddy, Rebecca Drover, Megan Fieker, Karen Flores, Nancy Hanson, Jena Huey, Samantha Jacoby, Megan Kaden, Candace Kimmel, Kerry Mandley, Cassandra Mulvey, Joshua Nadel, Melanie Nilius Nowlin, Daniel Pasternacki, Brianna Persons, Jessie Poppe, Katharine Shaffer, Emily Simmonds, Josie Willis, Renee Wray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al.(Connors, Terrence)
January 21, 2020 Filing 35 NOTICE of Appearance by Samantha J Katze on behalf of Fisher-Price, Inc., Fisher-Price, Inc., Mattel, Inc., Fisher Price, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al.(Katze, Samantha)
January 17, 2020 Filing 34 ENTRY ORDER memorializing the rulings made at the 12/9/19 Status Conference. Signed by Hon. Geoffrey Crawford on 1/17/20. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al. (JHF)
January 10, 2020 NOTICE: Status Conference for 2/3/2020 re-set for 2/10/2020 09:30 AM at U.S. Courthouse, 100 State Street, Courtroom 2, Rochester, NY 14614 before Hon. Geoffrey Crawford. Please note different Courtroom from previous hearings.For counsel wishing to appear via teleconference, call-in Instructions for (Courtroom 2) are:1) Dial 703-724-31002) When prompted for the "Number You Wish To Dial" enter: 4100011#3) When prompted for the "Security Pin" enter 9999# Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al. (JHF)
January 9, 2020 Filing 33 ENTRY ORDER denying as moot motions filed in the following cases: 1:19-CV-512: Docs. 3, 15, 20, 21, 321:19-CV-518: Docs. 13, 14, 231:19-CV-667: Docs. 8, 9, 201:19-CV-668: Docs. 8, 9, 201:19-CV-670: Docs. 9, 10, 211:19-CV-695: Docs. 6, 7, 211:19-CV-787: Docs. 6, 14The filing party is free to re-file the motion(s) within 30 days. Signed by Hon. Geoffrey Crawford on 1/9/20. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al. (JHF)
January 6, 2020 Filing 32 MEMORANDUM/BRIEF re (30 in 1:19-md-02903-GWC) Order [Supplemental Memorandum Relating to December 23, 2019 Order] by Fisher-Price, Inc., Fisher-Price, Inc., Mattel, Inc., Fisher Price, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al.(Marshack, Adrianne)
December 26, 2019 Filing 31 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on December 9, 2019, before Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. Court Reporter Diane S. Martens, Contact Info Diane_Martens@nywd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/16/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/27/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/25/2020. (DSM)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ON DISCOVERY. Signed by Hon. Geoffrey Crawford on 12/23/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al. (JHF)
December 20, 2019 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 2/3/2020 09:30 AM in US Courthouse, 100 State Street, Courtroom 1, Rochester NY 14614 before Hon. Geoffrey Crawford. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al. (JHF)
December 12, 2019 Filing 28 ANSWER to #19 Amended Complaint, by Fisher-Price, Inc., Mattel, Inc. (Marshack, Adrianne)
December 9, 2019 Filing 29 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Geoffrey Crawford: Status Conference held on 12/9/2019. The issues regarding class certification and what types of documents needed were discussed. The Court will schedule a Conference for late January or early February. Appearances: Diane Martens, Court Reporter, for the defendants: Craig de Recat, Esq., Adrianne Marshack, Esq., and Pat Naylon, Esq., local counsel from Goldberg & Segalla, for the plaintiffs: Demet Basar, Esq., Terrence M. Connors, Esq., Kate G. Howard, Esq., and Daniel Tepper, Esq. (Court Reporter Diane Martens.) (BK)
December 5, 2019 NOTICE: For counsel wishing to appear via teleconference, call-in Instructions (Courtroom 1) for Status Conference set for 12/9/2019 10:00 AM at U.S. Courthouse, 100 State Street, Rochester, NY 14614 before Hon. Geoffrey Crawford are: 1) Dial 703-724-31002) When prompted for the "Number You Wish To Dial" enter: 4100021# (Courtroom 1) 3) When prompted for the "Security Pin" enter 9999#Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al. (JHF)
December 4, 2019 Filing 27 Letter filed by Fisher-Price, Inc., Fisher Price, Inc., Mattel, Inc., Fisher-Price, Inc. as to Fisher-Price, Inc., Fisher Price, Inc., Mattel, Inc., Fisher-Price, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. addressing additional issues to be discussed at the December 9, 2019, Status Conference. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Subpoena to third party ASTM International)Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al.(Marshack, Adrianne)
December 4, 2019 E-Filing Notification: (19 in 1:19-cv-01087-GWC, 26 in 1:19-cv-01075-GWC, 49 in 1:19-cv-00512-GWC, 38 in 1:19-cv-00667-GWC, 22 in 1:19-cv-01107-GWC, 40 in 1:19-cv-00695-GWC, 31 in 1:19-cv-01076-GWC, 43 in 1:19-cv-01083-GWC, 18 in 1:19-cv-00791-GWC, 37 in 1:19-cv-00668-GWC, 20 in 1:19-cv-00941-GWC, 21 in 1:19-md-02903-GWC, 16 in 1:19-cv-00870-GWC, 39 in 1:19-cv-00670-GWC, 32 in 1:19-cv-00787-GWC, 42 in 1:19-cv-00518-GWC, 21 in 1:19-cv-01067-GWC) Clerk revised docket text to clarify the filing event. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al. (JHF)
December 2, 2019 Filing 26 Letter filed by Mattel, Inc., Fisher-Price, Inc. as to Fisher-Price, Inc., Fisher Price, Inc., Mattel, Inc., Fisher-Price, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. apprising Court of Defendants' positions on matters listed in December 2, 2019 Joint Status Report. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al.(Marshack, Adrianne)
December 2, 2019 Filing 25 Letter filed by Elizabeth Alfaro, Emily Barton, Linda Black, Luke Cuddy, Rebecca Drover, Megan Fieker, Karen Flores, Nancy Hanson, Jena Huey, Samantha Jacoby, Megan Kaden, Candace Kimmel, Kerry Mandley, Cassandra Mulvey, Joshua Nadel, Melanie Nilius Nowlin, Daniel Pasternacki, Brianna Persons, Jessie Poppe, Katharine Shaffer, Emily Simmonds, Josie Willis, Renee Wray as to Fisher-Price, Inc., Fisher Price, Inc., Mattel, Inc., Fisher-Price, Inc., Amazon.com, Inc. apprising Court of Plaintiffs' positions on matters listed in December 2, 2019 Joint Status Report. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Transcript of 2019.09.16 Status Conference, #2 Exhibit B - 2019.11.21 Letter, #3 Exhibit C - 2019.11.25 Letter, #4 Exhibit D - 2019.10.25 Letter, #5 Exhibit E - 2019.11.01 Letter, #6 Exhibit F - 2019.11.12 Letter)Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al.(Howard, Kate)
December 2, 2019 Filing 24 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Concerning Existence Of Disputes To Be Addressed At Status Conference by Elizabeth Alfaro, Emily Barton, Linda Black, Luke Cuddy, Rebecca Drover, Megan Fieker, Karen Flores, Nancy Hanson, Jena Huey, Samantha Jacoby, Megan Kaden, Candace Kimmel, Kerry Mandley, Cassandra Mulvey, Joshua Nadel, Melanie Nilius Nowlin, Daniel Pasternacki, Brianna Persons, Jessie Poppe, Katharine Shaffer, Emily Simmonds, Josie Willis, Renee Wray. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al.(Howard, Kate)
November 25, 2019 Filing 23 STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report Concerning Existence Of Disputes To Be Addressed At Status Conference by Katharine Shaffer, Elizabeth Alfaro, Emily Barton, Linda Black, Luke Cuddy, Rebecca Drover, Megan Fieker, Karen Flores, Nancy Hanson, Jena Huey, Samantha Jacoby, Megan Kaden, Candace Kimmel, Kerry Mandley, Cassandra Mulvey, Joshua Nadel, Melanie Nilius Nowlin, Daniel Pasternacki, Brianna Persons, Jessie Poppe, Emily Simmonds, Josie Willis, Renee Wray. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al.(Howard, Kate)
November 19, 2019 Filing 22 TEXT ORDER directing Counsel to advise by November 25, 2019, whether there are issues or disputes which require discussion at the Status Conference set for December 9, 2019. If there are none, the Court will postpone the conference for ninety (90) days. Signed by Hon. Geoffrey Crawford on 11/19/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al. (JHF)
November 15, 2019 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mattel, Inc. and Fisher-Price, Inc. Mattel, Inc. identifying No corporate parent and No publicly traded corporation owns 10 percent or more of its stock. Fisher-Price, Inc. identifying it as a wholly owned subsidiary of Mattel, Inc. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al. (Marshack, Adrianne) Modified on 12/4/2019 (JHF).
November 5, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Carl V. Malmstrom on behalf of Megan Kaden (Malmstrom, Carl)
October 29, 2019 E-Filing Notification: Clerk revised docket text of CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT to clarify the filing event and Clerk spread the document to all appropriate related cases. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al. (JHF)
October 28, 2019 Filing 19 CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Samantha Jacoby, Renee Wray, Josie Willis, Jessie Poppe, Karen Flores, Joshua Nadel, Candace Kimmel, Nancy Hanson, Cassandra Mulvey, Megan Fieker, Katharine Shaffer, Linda Black, Emily Barton, Luke Cuddy, Daniel Pasternacki, Megan Kaden, Kerry Mandley, Elizabeth Alfaro, Jena Huey, Melanie Nilius Nowlin, Rebecca Drover, Emily Simmonds, Brianna Persons. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (CLRA Letter), #2 Exhibit B (Response to CLRA Letter)) (Connors, Terrence) Modified on 10/29/2019 (JHF).
October 21, 2019 Filing 18 PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Hon. Geoffrey Crawford on 10/21/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al. (JHF)
October 15, 2019 Filing 17 Proposed Pretrial Order Proposed Protective Order by Emily Barton, Linda Black, Luke Cuddy, Samantha Drover-Mundy, Megan Fieker, Karen Flores, Nancy Hanson, Samantha Jacoby, Candace Kimmel, Cassandra Mulvey, Zachary Mundy, Mark Nabong, Joshua Nadel, Daniel Pasternacki, Jessie Poppe, Katharine Shaffer, Josie Willis, Renee Wray. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al.(Howard, Kate)
October 15, 2019 Filing 16 DISCOVERY PLAN by Emily Barton, Linda Black, Luke Cuddy, Samantha Drover-Mundy, Megan Fieker, Karen Flores, Nancy Hanson, Samantha Jacoby, Candace Kimmel, Cassandra Mulvey, Zachary Mundy, Mark Nabong, Joshua Nadel, Daniel Pasternacki, Jessie Poppe, Katharine Shaffer, Josie Willis, Renee Wray.Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al.(Howard, Kate)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting (44) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:19-cv-00512-GWC; granting (36) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:19-cv-00518-GWC; granting (32) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:19-cv-00667-GWC; granting (32) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:19-cv-00668-GWC; granting (33) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:19-cv-00670-GWC; granting (34) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:19-cv-00695-GWC; granting (26) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:19-cv-00787-GWC; granting (12) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:19-cv-00791-GWC; granting (10) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:19-cv-00870-GWC; granting (14) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:19-cv-00941-GWC; granting (14) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:19-md-02903-GWC; granting (15) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:19-cv-01067-GWC; granting (20) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:19-cv-01075-GWC; granting (25) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:19-cv-01076-GWC; granting (37) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:19-cv-01083-GWC; granting (13) Motion for Extension of Time to File in case 1:19-cv-01087-GWC; granting (16) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order and ESI Plan in case 1:19-cv-01107-GWC. Signed by Hon. Geoffrey Crawford on 10/10/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al.(JL)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order and ESI Plan by Emily Barton, Linda Black, Luke Cuddy, Samantha Drover-Mundy, Megan Fieker, Karen Flores, Nancy Hanson, Samantha Jacoby, Candace Kimmel, Cassandra Mulvey, Zachary Mundy, Mark Nabong, Joshua Nadel, Daniel Pasternacki, Jessie Poppe, Katharine Shaffer, Josie Willis, Renee Wray. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al.(Howard, Kate)
September 26, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Initial Conference) held on 9/16/19, before Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. Court Reporter/Transcriber Karen J. Bush, Contact Info 585-613-4312. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 10/17/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/28/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/26/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al. (JHF)
September 24, 2019 E-Filing Notification: Clerk exchanged original INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (12 in 1:19-cv-02903-GWC) with version with several corrections as pointed out by counsel. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al. (JHF)
September 20, 2019 Filing 12 INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Plaintiffs' service of Consolidated Amended Complaint (CAC) due by 10/28/19. Defendants' Response to CAC due by 12/12/2019. Plaintiffs' opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss, if any, due by 1/27/20. Defendants' Reply due by 2/18/2020. Plaintiffs' motion for class certification due by 4/1/20. Status Conference set for 12/9/2019 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, 100 State Street, Rochester NY 14614 before Hon. Geoffrey Crawford. Signed by Hon. Geoffrey Crawford on 9/20/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al. (JHF) (Main Document 12 replaced on 9/24/2019) (JHF). (Main Document 12 replaced on 9/24/2019) (JHF).
September 19, 2019 NOTICE: Status Conference set for 12/9/2019 10:00 AM at U.S. Courthouse, 100 State Street, Rochester, NY 14614 before Hon. Geoffrey Crawford. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al.(CAM)
September 16, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Geoffrey Crawford: Initial Conference held on 9/16/2019. The issues relating to bifurcation of discovery and class certification were addressed. ADR will not be addressed at this time due to the issue of class certification. Items in the Joint Proposed Discovery/Pleadings Schedules were discussed. Case Management Order to be issued. Appearances: John Schraven, Special Mediator. For plaintiffs: Demet Basar, Esq., Terrence M. Connors, Esq., Steven DeNittis, Esq., Kate G. Howard, Esq., Mark A. Smith, Esq., Jonathan Sorkowitz, Esq. and Daniel Tepper, Esq. For defendants: Craig J. de Recat, Esq., Matthew P. Kanny, Esq. and Patrick Naylon, Esq. (Court Reporter Karen Bush) Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al.(CAM)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick B. Naylon on behalf of Fisher-Price, Inc., Mattel, Inc. (JHF)
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 Letter filed by Emily Barton, Linda Black, Luke Cuddy, Samantha Drover-Mundy, Megan Fieker, Karen Flores, Nancy Hanson, Samantha Jacoby, Candace Kimmel, Cassandra Mulvey, Zachary Mundy, Mark Nabong, Joshua Nadel, Daniel Pasternacki, Jessie Poppe, Katharine Shaffer, Josie Willis, Renee Wray as to Mattel, Inc., Fisher-Price, Inc. to Court re: Combined Proposed Draft Initial Case Management Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Combined Proposed Draft Initial Case Management Order)(Basar, Demet)
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 Letter filed by Mattel, Inc., Fisher-Price, Inc. as to Mattel, Inc., Fisher-Price, Inc. re Comments/Additions to Draft Case Management Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Draft Case Management Order)(Marshack, Adrianne)
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Pretrial Order - Plaintiffs' Proposed Draft Initial Case Management Order by Emily Barton, Linda Black, Luke Cuddy, Samantha Drover-Mundy, Megan Fieker, Karen Flores, Nancy Hanson, Samantha Jacoby, Candace Kimmel, Cassandra Mulvey, Zachary Mundy, Mark Nabong, Joshua Nadel, Daniel Pasternacki, Jessie Poppe, Katharine Shaffer, Josie Willis, Renee Wray. (Basar, Demet)
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 Letter filed by Emily Barton, Linda Black, Luke Cuddy, Samantha Drover-Mundy, Megan Fieker, Karen Flores, Nancy Hanson, Samantha Jacoby, Candace Kimmel, Cassandra Mulvey, Zachary Mundy, Mark Nabong, Joshua Nadel, Daniel Pasternacki, Jessie Poppe, Katharine Shaffer, Josie Willis, Renee Wray as to Mattel, Inc., Fisher-Price, Inc. concerning pre-trial issues. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wolf Haldenstein Firm Resume, #2 Exhibit B - Connors LLP Firm Resume, #3 Exhibit C - DeNittis Osefchen Firm Resume, #4 Exhibit D - Bursor & Fisher Firm Resume, #5 Exhibit E - Smolen & Roytman Firm Resume, #6 Exhibit F - Pierce Bainbridge Firm Resume)(Basar, Demet)
September 3, 2019 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER setting the Initial Conference for 9/16/2019 10:00 AM in US Courthouse, 100 State Street, Rochester NY 14614 before Hon. Geoffrey Crawford. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Geoffrey Crawford on 9/3/19. (PR)
September 3, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Conference set for 9/16/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, Federal Building, 100 State Street, Rochester, NY 14614 before Hon. Geoffrey Crawford. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al. (JHF)
August 21, 2019 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL for 1:19-CV-1107: MDL No. 19-MD-2903 has been opened and assigned to Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. See MDL Docket for further entries. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-01107-GWC, 1:19-md-02903-GWC (LB)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 8/19/19. Inadvertently not docketed on case when initially filed. (JHF)
August 16, 2019 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL for 1:19-CV-1087: MDL No. 19-MD-2903 has been opened and assigned to Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. See MDL Docket for further entries. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC, 1:19-cv-01087-GWC (JHF)
August 15, 2019 Filing 2 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 8/14/19. (JHF)
August 15, 2019 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL for 1:19-CV-1083: MDL No. 19-MD-2903 has been opened and assigned to Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. See MDL Docket for further entries. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC, 1:19-cv-01083-GWC (JHF)
August 14, 2019 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL for 1:19-CV-1075 and 1:19-CV-1076: MDL No. 19-MD-2903 has been opened and assigned to Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. See MDL Docket for further entries. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC, 1:19-cv-01075-GWC, 1:19-cv-01076-GWC (JHF)
August 13, 2019 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL for 1:19-CV-1067: MDL No. 19-MD-2903 has been opened and assigned to Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. See MDL Docket for further entries. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC, 1:19-cv-01067-GWC (JHF)
August 12, 2019 NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL: MDL No. 19-MD-2903 has been opened and assigned to Judge Geoffrey W. Crawford. See MDL Docket for further entries. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02903-GWC et al. (JHF)
August 12, 2019 Filing 1 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair, Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on 8/1/19. (JHF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Fisher-Price Rock 'n Play Sleeper Marketing, Sales Practices, and Products Liability Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fisher-Price, Inc.
Represented By: Cheryl A. Possenti
Represented By: Adrianne Elizabeth Marshack
Represented By: Matthew Paul Kanny
Represented By: Patrick B. Naylon
Represented By: Jennifer Lea Struble
Represented By: Craig Joseph de Recat
Represented By: Samantha J Katze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mattel, Inc.
Represented By: Cheryl A. Possenti
Represented By: Adrianne Elizabeth Marshack
Represented By: Matthew Paul Kanny
Represented By: Patrick B. Naylon
Represented By: Jennifer Lea Struble
Represented By: Craig Joseph de Recat
Represented By: Samantha J Katze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessie Poppe
Represented By: Gary S. Graifman
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Barton
Represented By: Kate G. Howard
Represented By: Demet Basar
Represented By: Caitlin M Higgins
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Represented By: Kate M McGuire
Represented By: Daniel Tepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Candace Kimmel
Represented By: Kate G. Howard
Represented By: Caitlin M Higgins
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Represented By: Stephen P. DeNittis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Drover-Mundy
Represented By: Jonathan A. Sorkowitz
Represented By: Melody Lynn McGowin
Represented By: Andrew J. Lorin
Represented By: Kristin Darr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Jacoby
Represented By: Gary S. Graifman
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Nabong
Represented By: Kate G. Howard
Represented By: Demet Basar
Represented By: Caitlin M Higgins
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Represented By: Kate M McGuire
Represented By: Daniel Tepper
Represented By: Carl V. Malmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Nadel
Represented By: Gary S. Graifman
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katharine Shaffer
Represented By: Kate G. Howard
Represented By: Demet Basar
Represented By: Caitlin M Higgins
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Represented By: Kate M McGuire
Represented By: Daniel Tepper
Represented By: Carl V. Malmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luke Cuddy
Represented By: Kate G. Howard
Represented By: Demet Basar
Represented By: Caitlin M Higgins
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Represented By: Kate M McGuire
Represented By: Daniel Tepper
Represented By: Carl V. Malmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Mundy
Represented By: Jonathan A. Sorkowitz
Represented By: Melody Lynn McGowin
Represented By: Andrew J. Lorin
Represented By: Kristin Darr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Pasternacki
Represented By: Kate G. Howard
Represented By: Demet Basar
Represented By: Caitlin M Higgins
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Represented By: Kate M McGuire
Represented By: Daniel Tepper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandra Mulvey
Represented By: Kate G. Howard
Represented By: Demet Basar
Represented By: Caitlin M Higgins
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Represented By: Kate M McGuire
Represented By: Daniel Tepper
Represented By: Elbert F. Nasis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josie Willis
Represented By: Benjamin A. Gastel
Represented By: Jonathan S. Mann
Represented By: Lauren S. Miller
Represented By: Douglas A. Dellaccio, Jr.
Represented By: Hirlye R. Lutz, III
Represented By: Christopher T. Hellums
Represented By: Frank Jerome Tapley
Represented By: James Gerard Stranch, IV
Represented By: Adam Wade Pittman
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Flores
Represented By: Marc G Reich
Represented By: Alison S Gokal
Represented By: Adam T Hoover
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Represented By: Marc Gene Reich
Represented By: Adam Todd Hoover
Represented By: Alison Swicker Gokal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Fieker
Represented By: Dennis Albert Caruso
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Represented By: Daniel Elliot Smolen
Represented By: Lauren Grace Lambright
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Drover
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Hanson
Represented By: John Barton Goplerud
Represented By: Brian O. Marty
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Wray
Represented By: Mark Allen Smith
Represented By: Anthony Calbert Savastano
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Black
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Represented By: Blair Elizabeth Reed
Represented By: Scott A Bursor
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kerry Mandley
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Nilius Nowlin
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emily Simmonds
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jena Huey
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Alfaro
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Megan Kaden
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Represented By: Carl V. Malmstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brianna Persons
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Fisher-Price Rock 'n Play Sleeper Marketing, Sales Practices, and Products Liability Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Katherine Shaffer
Represented By: Jonathan A. Sorkowitz
Represented By: Melody Lynn McGowin
Represented By: Andrew J. Lorin
Represented By: Kristin Darr
Represented By: Kate M McGuire
Represented By: Stephen P. DeNittis
Represented By: Brittany DeJong
Represented By: Rachele R Byrd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?