Buczek v. Key Bank National Association
Appellee: Key Bank National Association
Appellant: Shane Christopher Buczek
Case Number: 1:2020cv00010
Filed: January 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: John L Sinatra
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Key Bank National Association identifying Corporate Parent KeyCorp, an Ohio Corporation for Key Bank National Association.. (Case, David)
January 23, 2020 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (CGJ)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #2 Notice (Other), #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, by Key Bank National Association. (Case, David)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (SG) Copy mailed to plaintiff.
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-11441. File received, filed by Shane Christopher Buczek. (Attachments: #1 BK Transmittal, #2 BK Docket Sheet, #3 BK No. 151 Order, #4 BK No. 151-1, #5 BK No. 151-2, #6 BK No. 151-3, #7 BK No. 159 Application)(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buczek v. Key Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Key Bank National Association
Represented By: David P. Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Shane Christopher Buczek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?