Buffalo Bills, LLC v. Caccamo et al
Plaintiff: Buffalo Bills, LLC
Defendant: Vincent Caccamo, APS Solutions, Inc. and Stephanie Caccamo
Case Number: 1:2020cv00023
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Stephanie Caccamo on January 18, 2020, filed by Buffalo Bills, LLC. (Reina, Jeffrey)
February 5, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service served on Vincent Caccamo on January 18, 2020, filed by Buffalo Bills, LLC. (Reina, Jeffrey)
January 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to APS Solutions, Inc., Stephanie Caccamo, Vincent Caccamo. (CGJ)
January 9, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ)
January 9, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(CGJ)
January 9, 2020 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (CGJ)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against APS Solutions, Inc., Stephanie Caccamo, Vincent Caccamo $ 400 receipt number 0209-3700900, filed by Buffalo Bills, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-E, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Reina, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buffalo Bills, LLC v. Caccamo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Caccamo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APS Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Caccamo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buffalo Bills, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey F. Reina
Represented By: Michael Schiavone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?