Buczek v. Keybank National Association
Appellee: Keybank National Association
Appellant: Shane Christopher Buczek
Case Number: 1:2020cv00080
Filed: January 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: John L Sinatra
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 11 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER re #3 Emergency Motion for Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order by Shane Christopher Buczek and #5 Affidavit in Opposition by Keybank National Associaion. The motion will be decided on the papers and without oral argument, pursuant to Rule 8019(b)(3) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 3/19/2020. (KLH)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 Letter filed regarding status of Motion for Injunction and status of the March 25, 2020 Sale. (Case, David)
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #3 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order MOTION Emergency Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order filed by Keybank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Opposition, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Certificate of Service)(Case, David)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SCHEDULING ORDER re #3 Emergency Motion for Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order by Shane Christopher Buczek. Appellee Keybanks response due by 3/18/2020. Appellant Buczeks reply due by 3/23/2020. Given the indicated sale date of March 25, 2020, Appellant Buczek is directed to provide a courtesy copy of his reply brief, on the same day that the filing is due, by fax to 716-551-1645. If necessary, the Court will schedule oral argument at a later time. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 3/16/2020 (CJG) Modified on 3/16/2020 to add additional directive regarding reply brief. (KLH)
March 16, 2020 E-Filing Notification re 4 SCHEDULING ORDER: This entry/order has been modified to add an additional directive regarding appellant's reply brief: Given the indicated sale date of March 25, 2020, Appellant Buczek is directed to provide a courtesy copy of his reply brief, on the same day that the filing is due, by fax to 716-551-1645. (Chambers has mailed a copy of this E-Filing Notification to appellant, along with a copy of 4 Scheduling Order, as modified.) (KLH)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 EMERGENCY MOTION for Injunction and Temporary Restraining Order by Shane Christopher Buczek.(KM)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (SG) Copy mailed to Appellant.
January 22, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT. Bankruptcy Court case number 19-11441. File received, filed by Shane Christopher Buczek. (Attachments: #1 BK Docket Sheet, #2 Transmittal, #3 BK No. 189 Corrective Order)(SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buczek v. Keybank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Keybank National Association
Represented By: David P. Case
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Shane Christopher Buczek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?