Jones v. The City of Rochester et al
Plaintiff: Shannon Jones
Defendant: The City of Rochester, Police Officer Erin Rodgers, Police Officer Cory Roth, Police Officer Joseph Briganti, Police Officer Gulla, Police Officer Eluid Rodriguez, Police Officer Richard Stone, Police Officer Tucker, Police Officer Micheal Munier, Police Officer Kevin Jakes, Police Officer Maura Hayes, Police Officer Erin Alliet, Police Officer Johnathan Nettin, Police Officer Dustin Reed, Police Officer Jack Geary, Police Officer Geoffrey Wicher, Sgt. Adams and Police Officer Audrey Jackson
Case Number: 1:2020cv00545
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Frank P Geraci
Referring Judge: William M Skretny
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Remark: Clerk mailed copy of # 7 along with instructions and forms for filing an amended complaint to Shannon Jones. (MD)
June 16, 2020 Filing 7 DECISION and ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; denying #6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Plaintiff's state constitutional claims are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff is granted leave to file an amended complaint regarding the remaining claims identified as directed by August 15,2020. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended complaint by August 15,2020 the Clerk of Court is directed to close this case as dismissed with prejudice. In the event the complaint is dismissed because the Plaintiff has failed to file an amended complaint, the Court certifies that leave to appeal to the Court of Appeals as a poor person is denied Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 6/16/2020. (KM)
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Shannon Jones.(KM)
June 5, 2020 Clerk mailed motion to appoint counsel form to pro se plaintiff. (JHF)
June 4, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Shannon Jones. Defendant's address changed to: Shannon Jones, 28861-055, NEOCC, 2240 Hubbard Road, Youngstown, OH 44505. (JHF)
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from Shannon Jones, dated 5/26/20, to Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) Clerk mailed blank motion to appoint counsel form to pro se plaintiff. (JHF)
May 12, 2020 Clerk mailed copy of 3 Text Order to pro se plaintiff. (JHF)
May 11, 2020 Case Reassigned to Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. Hon. William M. Skretny no longer assigned to the case. (JHF)
May 11, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ORDER -- IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that the Clerk of Court reassign this case to a Rochester-based district judge. Issued by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 5/11/2020. (JCM)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
May 6, 2020 Prisoner Pro Se Packet consisting of Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge and Civil Case Timeline mailed to plaintiff. (JHF)
May 6, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JHF)
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shannon Jones. (JHF)
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Adams, Erin Alliet, Joseph Briganti, Jack Geary, Gulla, Maura Hayes, Audrey Jackson, Kevin Jakes, Micheal Munier, Johnathan Nettin, Dustin Reed, Erin Rodgers, Eluid Rodriguez, Cory Roth, Richard Stone, The City of Rochester, Tucker, Geoffrey Wicher, filed by Shannon Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (JHF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. The City of Rochester et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City of Rochester
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Erin Rodgers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Cory Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Joseph Briganti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Gulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Eluid Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Richard Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Micheal Munier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Kevin Jakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Maura Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Erin Alliet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Johnathan Nettin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Dustin Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Jack Geary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Geoffrey Wicher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Police Officer Audrey Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?