Solidifi Title & Closing, LLC v. Bradley et al
Plaintiff: SOLIDIFI TITLE & CLOSING, LLC
Defendant: AURO SOLUTIONS, LLC, KEVIN W BRADLEY and Kevin W. Bradley
Case Number: 1:2020cv00552
Filed: May 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: John L Sinatra
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Filing 19 TEXT ORDER acknowledging #18 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal. This action is dismissed with prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 8/26/2020. (KLH)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
August 25, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION of Dismissal Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal by Solidifi Title & Closing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fabian, Shawn)
August 7, 2020 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER: Defendants' #16 Letter Requesting Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint is GRANTED. Defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 8/28/2020. In light of this text order, the e-filing notification entered by the clerk's office on 8/7/2020 is moot. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 8/7/2020. (CMED)
August 7, 2020 E-Filing Notification: regarding #16 Letter this document contains a request for relief and should be filed as a motion. ACTION REQUIRED: Re-file document using the motion event. (JLV)
August 6, 2020 Filing 16 Letter filed by Auro Solutions, LLC, Kevin W. Bradley as to Auro Solutions, LLC, Kevin W. Bradley Requesting Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint from August 14, 2020 to no later than August 28, 2020. (Fensterstock, Evan)
July 7, 2020 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER: Defendant's #14 letter requesting, with consent of counsel, an extension of Defendant's deadline to respond to the Complaint is GRANTED. Defendant is directed to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 8/14/2020. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 7/7/2020. (KLH)
July 7, 2020 Filing 14 Letter filed by Auro Solutions, LLC, Kevin W. Bradley as to Auro Solutions, LLC, Kevin W. Bradley Requesting Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint from July 10, 2020 to no later than August 14, 2020. (Fensterstock, Evan)
June 23, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Evan Steele Fensterstock on behalf of All Defendants (Fensterstock, Evan)
June 23, 2020 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Auro Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Auro Holdings, LLC for Auro Solutions, LLC.. (Fensterstock, Evan)
May 21, 2020 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER re #10 Letter Requesting an Extension. The Court grants Defendants' letter request, submitted with consent of Plaintiff's counsel, for an extension of time to respond to the Complaint. Defendant is directed to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint by 7/10/2020. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 5/21/2020. (KLH)
May 21, 2020 Filing 10 Letter Motion - Request for extension of time to respond to the complaint by Kevin W. Bradley and Auro Solutions, LLC. (KLH)
May 20, 2020 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
May 19, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Reissued as to Auro Solutions, LLC. (CGJ)
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 Original Summons Filed. (Fabian, Shawn)
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #5 and #6 Motions to appear pro hac vice. Attorneys Mikela T. Sutrina and Kevin M. Cloutier may appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff Solidifi Title & Closing, LLC. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 5/13/2020. (KLH)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
May 12, 2020 Verified admission to the Illinois State Bar for Attorney Kevin M. Cloutier. (MD)
May 12, 2020 Verified admission to the Illinois State Bar for Attorney Mikela T. Sutrina. (MD)
May 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $ 200.) by Solidifi Title & Closing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Admission Petition Form, #2 Admission Sponsor Affidavit, #3 Attorney's Oath, #4 Civility Principles Oath, #5 Attorney Database and ECF Registration Form)(Fabian, Shawn)
May 11, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to appear pro hac vice (Filing fee $ 200.) by Solidifi Title & Closing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Admission Petition Form, #2 Admission Sponsor Affidavit, #3 Attorney's Oath, #4 Civility Principles Oath, #5 Attorney Database and ECF Registration Form)(Fabian, Shawn)
May 11, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Auro Solutions, LLC, Kevin W. Bradley. (CGJ)
May 11, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ)
May 11, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(CGJ)
May 11, 2020 Case assigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (CGJ)
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SOLIDIFI TITLE & CLOSING, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Solidifi Corp., Corporate Parent RM Title LLC, Corporate Parent RM Ventures LLC, Corporate Parent Solidifi U.S. Inc., Corporate Parent Real Matters Inc. for SOLIDIFI TITLE & CLOSING, LLC.. (Fabian, Shawn)
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Shawn D. Fabian on behalf of SOLIDIFI TITLE & CLOSING, LLC (Fabian, Shawn)
May 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AURO SOLUTIONS, LLC, KEVIN W BRADLEY $ 400 receipt number 0209-3827270, filed by SOLIDIFI TITLE & CLOSING, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons to Kevin W. Bradley, #5 Summons to Auro Solutions, LLC)(Fabian, Shawn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Solidifi Title & Closing, LLC v. Bradley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AURO SOLUTIONS, LLC
Represented By: Evan Steele Fensterstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KEVIN W BRADLEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin W. Bradley
Represented By: Evan Steele Fensterstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOLIDIFI TITLE & CLOSING, LLC
Represented By: Shawn D. Fabian
Represented By: Kevin M. Cloutier
Represented By: Mikela T. Sutrina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?