Braun v. Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel LLC et al
Plaintiff: Kandi Brown and Kandi Braun
Defendant: ABC, Inc., ABC LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, ABC, LLC and Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00753
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Michael J Roemer
Referring Judge: John L Sinatra
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Ashley C. Glosser, Esq. to appeear Pro Hac Vice. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 7/7/2020. (RAZ)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
July 7, 2020 Verified admission to the New York State Bar State Bar for Attorney Ashley C. Glosser. (MD)
July 2, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Ashley C.Glosser ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-3889869.) by Kandi Braun. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Supporting Attorney Affidavit, #2 Supplement Admission Petition Form, #3 Supplement Sponsor Affidavit, #4 Supplement Attorney's Oath, #5 Supplement Civility Oath, #6 Supplement Electronic Filing Registration Form, #7 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Freid, Wayne)
June 25, 2020 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TF)
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by ABC Limited Partnership, ABC, Inc., ABC, LLC, Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel LLC.(Jablonski, John)
June 22, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. Michael J. Roemer, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 6/22/2020. (KLH)
June 18, 2020 E-Filing Notification: re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL. Action Required: Attorney is directed to file an index identifying State Court documents pursuant to local rule 81(A). Please use the Continuation of Exhibits Event, found under Responses and Replies. (CGJ)
June 18, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ)
June 18, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(CGJ)
June 18, 2020 Case assigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (CGJ)
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ABC LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, ABC, Inc., ABC, LLC, Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel LLC. (Jablonski, John)
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by ABC LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel LLC, ABC, LLC, ABC, Inc. from Supreme Court, Erie County, case number 805057/2020. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3871227), filed by ABC LIMITED PARTNERSHIP, Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel LLC, ABC, LLC, ABC, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jablonski, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Braun v. Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC, Inc.
Represented By: John J. Jablonski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC LIMITED PARTNERSHIP
Represented By: John J. Jablonski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC, LLC
Represented By: John J. Jablonski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel LLC
Represented By: John J. Jablonski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kandi Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kandi Braun
Represented By: Wayne I. Freid
Represented By: Ashley C. Glosser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?