Tojek v. Swift
Plaintiff: Bridgette A Tojek
Defendant: Lyndsey Swift
Case Number: 1:2020cv00755
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: John L Sinatra
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's unopposed motion for extension of time to file a response to Defendant's motion. Plaintiffs response is due on or before September 9, 2020. Defendant's reply is due on or before September 23, 2020. The Court will schedule oral argument if necessary. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 8/10/2020. (KLH) Copy mailed to Plaintiff.
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 PLAINTIFF'S Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file a Response to #2 Motion by Bridgette A Tojek.(KM)
August 5, 2020 Filing 4 Letter filed by Lyndsey Swift as to Lyndsey Swift . (Cerrone, Michael)
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT ORDER re #2 Motion to Substitute Party, Motion to Dismiss Complaint. Plaintiff's response due on or before July 28, 2020. Defendant's reply due on or before August 11, 2020. The Court will schedule oral argument if necessary. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 6/30/2020. (Copy mailed to Plaintiff.) (KLH)
June 23, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Substitute Party, MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Lyndsey Swift. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Kimberly A. Herbst, #2 Exhibit Certification, #3 Exhibit Memorandum of Law)(Cerrone, Michael) Modified on 6/29/2020 to correct title and relief sought (KLH).
June 19, 2020 Remark: Plaintiff has been mailed a pro se packet including a privacy notice, consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge, Pro Se Assistance Program Information, and ADR Notification. (CGJ)
June 19, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(CGJ)
June 19, 2020 Case assigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (CGJ)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lyndsey Swift from Supreme, case number 47688., filed by Lyndsey Swift. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cerrone, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tojek v. Swift
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bridgette A Tojek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lyndsey Swift
Represented By: Michael S. Cerrone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?