Greene et al v. Town of Hamburg Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Lori A. Greene, Lawrence B. Greene and Lori A. Notaro-Greene
Defendant: Town of Hamburg Police, Town of Hamburg Police Department, Town of Hamburg, Jane Doe, John Doe and Paul Dhand
Case Number: 1:2020cv00906
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: H Kenneth Schroeder
Referring Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER regarding issuance of Case Management Order. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 8/24/20. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Order Form, #2 Consent Memorandum, #3 Consent Form)(LMG)
August 24, 2020 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(SG)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr., United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 8/24/2020. (CMD)
August 21, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Paul Dhand, Jane Doe, John Doe, Town of Hamburg.(Coutu, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Original summons not submitted. (CGJ)
July 17, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ)
July 17, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(CGJ)
July 17, 2020 Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (CGJ)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3905358, filed by Lawrence B. Greene, Lori A. Greene. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Certificate of Service)(Bruce, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greene et al v. Town of Hamburg Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Hamburg Police
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Hamburg Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Hamburg
Represented By: Michael T. Coutu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Doe
Represented By: Michael T. Coutu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: Michael T. Coutu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Dhand
Represented By: Michael T. Coutu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori A. Greene
Represented By: Anthony M. Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence B. Greene
Represented By: Anthony M. Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori A. Notaro-Greene
Represented By: Anthony M. Bruce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?