Van Bourgondien v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Shawn Joseph Van Bourgondien
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv00997
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Andreea Laura Lechleitner on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Lechleitner, Andreea)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court finds that plaintiff meets the statutory requirements for in forma pauperis status and therefore his motion (Docket # 2) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to file plaintiff's papers without payment of fees. The service of the complaint has been performed in accordance with WDNY Local Rule 5.5. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 8/12/20. (NNR)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Attached issued summons and complaint served electronically on the defendant pursuant to Western District of New York's Local Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(JD)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Case placed in Social Security Assignment Pool. (JD)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shawn Joseph Van Bourgondien.(Hiller, Kenneth)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Shawn Joseph Van Bourgondien. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Hiller, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Van Bourgondien v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Andreea Laura Lechleitner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Joseph Van Bourgondien
Represented By: Kenneth R. Hiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?