Lake Region Manufacturing, Inc. v. Estate of Stephen Paul Dretler
Plaintiff: Lake Region Manufacturing, Inc.
Defendant: Estate of Stephen Paul Dretler
Case Number: 1:2020cv01001
Filed: July 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: William M Skretny
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lake Region Manufacturing, Inc.. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service, #2 Waiver of Service)(Muldoon, James)
August 12, 2020 Case reassigned to Hon. William M. Skretny. Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. no longer assigned to the case. (TF)
August 11, 2020 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL: Due to a conflict, I hereby recuse myself from further involvement in this matter and ask the Clerk of the Court to reassign this matter to another district judge. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 8/11/2020. (KLH)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lake Region Manufacturing, Inc.. (Muldoon, James)
August 3, 2020 Remark: Filing fee paid twice. Please refer to refund policy located on our website: www.nywd.uscourts.gov (JD)
August 3, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Estate of Stephen Paul Dretler. (JD)
August 3, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD)
August 3, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(JD)
August 3, 2020 Case Assigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD)
July 31, 2020 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint signed Civil Cover Sheet. (Muldoon, James)
July 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Estate of Stephen Paul Dretler $ 400 receipt number 0209-3923299, filed by Lake Region Manufacturing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Muldoon, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lake Region Manufacturing, Inc. v. Estate of Stephen Paul Dretler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Stephen Paul Dretler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lake Region Manufacturing, Inc.
Represented By: James R. Muldoon
Represented By: Steven Paul Nonkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?