Joan Mazgaj and Debra Ceccarelli v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Joan Mazgaj and Debra Ceccarelli, as Co-Administrators of the Estate of Carol J. McGarrity (Deceased) and Joan Mazgaj and Debra Ceccarelli
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc., Johnson & Johnson Consumer Compaines, Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2020cv01061
Filed: August 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey Crawford
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Case opened in the District of New Jersey under case number 3:20-cv-11173. (CGJ)
August 24, 2020 Filing 3 MULTIDISTRICT CONDITIONAL LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER transferring the action to the District of New Jersey. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 8/24/2020. (CGJ)
August 12, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD)
August 12, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(JD)
August 12, 2020 Case Assigned to Hon. Geoffrey Crawford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD)
August 11, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Defendants on 08/11/2020 by Joan Mazgaj and Debra Ceccarelli, as Co-Administrators of the Estate of Carol J. McGarrity (Deceased). Waiver of Service due by 10/12/2020. (Goldstein, Brian)
August 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. $ 400 receipt number 0209-3933359, filed by Joan Mazgaj and Debra Ceccarelli, as Co-Administrators of the Estate of Carol J. McGarrity (Deceased). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goldstein, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joan Mazgaj and Debra Ceccarelli v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Compaines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Mazgaj and Debra Ceccarelli, as Co-Administrators of the Estate of Carol J. McGarrity (Deceased)
Represented By: Brian A. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Mazgaj and Debra Ceccarelli
Represented By: Brian A. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?