Kim-Chee LLC v. Yup Chagi Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kim-Chee LLC and Yup Chagi Inc. doing business as Master Gorino's Pil-Sung Tae-Kwon-Do
Defendant: Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp., Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company and Philadelphia Insurance Companies
Case Number: 1:2020cv01136
Filed: August 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Christina Reiss
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint filed by Kim-Chee LLC, Yup Chagi Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Memorandum in Support Opposition, #27 Exhibit A)(Berloth, Christopher)
October 22, 2020 Filing 16 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion to admit Jeffrey Zachman, Esq. Pro Hac Vice ; granting #11 Motion to admit Richard Fenton, Esq. Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Hon. Christina Reiss on 10/22/20. (SG)
October 22, 2020 Verified admission to the Illinois State Bar for Attorney Richard L. Fenton. (MD)
October 22, 2020 Verified admission to the Georgia State Bar for Attorney Jeffrey A. Zachman. (MD)
October 20, 2020 Filing 15 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp., Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. to #11 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Richard Fenton, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4001489.) Original Petition of Richard L. Fenton filed by Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp., Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit WDNY Civility Principles Oath, #2 Exhibit Attorney's Oath, #3 Exhibit Attorney Database Electronic Case Filing Reg. Form., #4 Exhibit U.S.D.C. Western District NY Petition)(Angelino, Sharon)
October 20, 2020 Filing 14 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp., Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. to #10 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Jeffrey Zachman, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4001346.) Initial Petition of Jeffrey Zachman filed by Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp., Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit WDNY Civility Principles Oath, #2 Exhibit Attorney's Oath, #3 Exhibit Attorney Database Electronic Case Filing Reg. Form., #4 Exhibit U.S.D.C. Western District NY Petition)(Angelino, Sharon)
October 15, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION Page Limit Extension by Kim-Chee LLC, Yup Chagi Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Christopher M. Berloth, #2 Motion for Extension)(Berloth, Christopher)
October 8, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp., Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit /Affirmation of Sharon Angelino, Esq., #2 Exhibit A -- Transcript of May 14, 2020, #3 Exhibit B -- Order, #4 Exhibit C -- Transcript of July 1, 2020, #5 Exhibit D -- Transcript and Order, #6 Exhibit E -- Order, #7 Memorandum in Support)(Angelino, Sharon)
October 7, 2020 E-Filing Notification: #10 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Jeffrey Zachman, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4001346.), #11 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Richard Fenton, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4001489.)The Court's forms must be used for if retyped be identical. Action Required:Please resubmit the following forms using the Continuation of Exhibits event for each Attorney seeking Pro Hac Vice admission:Petition form, Sponsoring Affidavit, Attorney's Oath, Civility Oath and Attorney Database & Electronic Case Filing Registration Form (MD)
October 6, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Richard Fenton, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4001489.) by Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp., Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sharon Angelino (Sponsoring), #2 Petition of Richard Fenton, #3 Proposed Order granting PHV, #4 Certificate of Service)(Angelino, Sharon)
October 6, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Jeffrey Zachman, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4001346.) by Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp., Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Sharon Angelino (Sponsoring), #2 Petition of Jeffrey Zachman, #3 Proposed Order granting PHV, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Angelino, Sharon)
September 23, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kim-Chee LLC, Yup Chagi Inc.. (Berloth, Christopher)
September 18, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Act by Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp., Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Angelino, Sharon)
September 16, 2020 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
September 4, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kim-Chee LLC, Yup Chagi Inc.. Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp. served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. (Berloth, Christopher)
September 4, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kim-Chee LLC, Yup Chagi Inc.. Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company served on 9/3/2020, answer due 9/24/2020. (Berloth, Christopher)
September 1, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp., Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 summons)(SG)
August 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas D Lyons on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Lyons, Thomas)
August 25, 2020 Filing 3 Original Summons Filed. (Berloth, Christopher)
August 25, 2020 Filing 2 Original Summons Filed. (Berloth, Christopher)
August 25, 2020 Remark: Original summons not submitted. (JD)
August 25, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD)
August 25, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(JD)
August 25, 2020 Case Assigned to Hon. Christina Reiss. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD)
August 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp., Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company $ 400 receipt number 0209-3949320, filed by Kim-Chee LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Policy, #3 Exhibit B - Virus Exclusion, #4 Exhibit C - NYC Executive Orders, #5 Exhibit D - DFS Directive, #6 Exhibit E - Denial Letter)(Berloth, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kim-Chee LLC v. Yup Chagi Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Consolidated Holding Corp.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Zachman
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Sharon Angelino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Zachman
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Sharon Angelino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Insurance Companies
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Zachman
Represented By: Richard L. Fenton
Represented By: Sharon Angelino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim-Chee LLC
Represented By: Christopher M. Berloth
Represented By: Thomas D Lyons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yup Chagi Inc. doing business as Master Gorino's Pil-Sung Tae-Kwon-Do
Represented By: Thomas D Lyons
Represented By: Christopher M. Berloth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?