Martinez v. Farmington Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Daniel Martinez
Defendant: Farmington Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv01151
Filed: August 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah J McCarthy
Referring Judge: John L Sinatra
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: a telephonic preliminary pretrial conference is set for 11/9/2020 at 10:00 a.m. before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy. To access the teleconference, the parties shall dial (888) 808-6929, enter access code 1533000# sufficiently in advance of the conference. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 10/14/2020. (EG)
October 14, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Farmington Casualty Company.(Engeldrum, Joanne)
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanne M. Engeldrum on behalf of Farmington Casualty Company (Engeldrum, Joanne)
September 21, 2020 E-Filing Notification: Please note for future reference that the proper event is summons returned executed. No action required RE #5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Farmington Casualty Company on 07/30/2020, filed by Daniel Martinez (TF)
September 18, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Farmington Casualty Company on 07/30/2020, filed by Daniel Martinez. (Perley, Michael)
September 16, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Farmington Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Ins., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holding, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Casualty and Surety Company for Farmington Casualty Company.. (Eagle, Alan)
September 16, 2020 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
August 31, 2020 Filing 3 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 8/31/2020. (KLH)
August 28, 2020 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Farmington Casualty Company. to #1 Notice of Removal, State Court Index filed by Farmington Casualty Company. (Eagle, Alan)
August 27, 2020 E-Filing Notification: Action Required: Attorney is directed to file an index identifying State Court documents pursuant to local rule 81(A). (JD)
August 27, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD)
August 27, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(JD)
August 27, 2020 Case Assigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD)
August 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Farmington Casualty Company from Supreme Court Erie County, case number 807447/2020. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-3952405), filed by Farmington Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Eagle, Alan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Farmington Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farmington Casualty Company
Represented By: Alan C. Eagle
Represented By: Joanne M. Engeldrum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Martinez
Represented By: Michael F. Perley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?