Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection et al v. JPL Recovery Solutions, LLC et al
Plaintiff: State of New York, Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection and People of the State of New York
Defendant: Regency One Capital, LLC, Check Security Associates, Scott A Croce, ROC Asset Solutions, LLC., Marc D Gracie, Christopher L Di Re, Keystone Recovery Group, LLC, Brian J Koziel, JPL Recovery Solutions, LLC and Check Security Associates, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01217
Filed: September 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: John L Sinatra
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2020 Filing 22 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Keystone Recovery Group, LLC. (Connors, Terrence)
October 2, 2020 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Regency One Capital, LLC. (Connors, Terrence)
October 2, 2020 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ROC Asset Solutions, LLC.. (Connors, Terrence)
October 2, 2020 Filing 19 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Check Security Associates, LLC. (Connors, Terrence)
October 2, 2020 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPL Recovery Solutions, LLC. (Connors, Terrence)
October 2, 2020 Filing 17 TEXT ORDER. For the reasons stated in Dkt. 16, the Court grants the request by Defendants Scott A. Croce and Christopher DiRe to extend their time to respond to the complaint. Those defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 11/10/2020. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 10/2/2020. (KEF)
October 2, 2020 Filing 16 Letter filed by Scott A Croce as to Regency One Capital, LLC, Marc D Gracie, JPL Recovery Solutions, LLC, Keystone Recovery Group, LLC, Scott A Croce, Christopher L Di Re, Check Security Associates, LLC, Brian J Koziel, ROC Asset Solutions, LLC. . (Knoer, Colin)
October 1, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard C. Slisz on behalf of Christopher L Di Re. (KM)
October 1, 2020 Filing 15 TEXT ORDER. For the reasons stated in Dkt. 14, the Court grants the request by Defendants Regency One Capital, LLC, JPL Recovery Solutions, LLC, ROC Asset Solutions, LLC, Check Security Associates, LLC, Marc D Gracie, Keystone Recovery Group, LLC, and Brian J Koziel to extend their time to respond to the complaint. Those defendants shall answer or otherwise respond to the complaint by 11/10/2020. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 10/1/2020. (KEF)
October 1, 2020 Filing 14 Letter filed by Regency One Capital, LLC, Marc D Gracie, JPL Recovery Solutions, LLC, Keystone Recovery Group, LLC, Check Security Associates, LLC, Brian J Koziel, ROC Asset Solutions, LLC. as to Regency One Capital, LLC, Marc D Gracie, JPL Recovery Solutions, LLC, Keystone Recovery Group, LLC, Scott A Croce, Christopher L Di Re, Check Security Associates, LLC, Brian J Koziel, ROC Asset Solutions, LLC. Extension Request for Time to File Response. (Debbins, Andrew)
September 28, 2020 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven(7) days of this notice. (MD)
September 28, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Colin Marshall Knoer on behalf of Scott A Croce (Knoer, Colin)
September 28, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert E. Knoer on behalf of Scott A Croce (Knoer, Robert)
September 24, 2020 Case reassigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr.. Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo no longer assigned to the case. (SG)
September 24, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew M. Debbins on behalf of Check Security Associates, LLC, Marc D Gracie, JPL Recovery Solutions, LLC, Keystone Recovery Group, LLC, Brian J Koziel, ROC Asset Solutions, LLC., Regency One Capital, LLC (Debbins, Andrew)
September 23, 2020 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER. The Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo hereby recuses himself in this matter. The Clerk of Court is hereby requested to assign this case to another United States District Judge. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 9/23/2020. (CMD)
September 22, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Terrence M. Connors on behalf of Check Security Associates, LLC, Marc D Gracie, JPL Recovery Solutions, LLC, Keystone Recovery Group, LLC, Brian J Koziel, ROC Asset Solutions, LLC., Regency One Capital, LLC (Connors, Terrence)
September 15, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by People of the State of New York as to Defendants Christopher Di Re, Keystone Recovery Group LLC, Roc Asset Solutions LLC, JPL Recovery Solutions LLC and Check Security Associates LLC (Boyd, Christopher)
September 15, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by People of the State of New York as to Defendant Regency One Capital LLC (Boyd, Christopher)
September 15, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by People of the State of New York as to Defendants Marc Gracie and Brian Koziel (Boyd, Christopher)
September 9, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Check Security Associates, LLC, Scott A Croce, Christopher L Di Re, Marc D Gracie, JPL Recovery Solutions, LLC, Keystone Recovery Group, LLC, Brian J Koziel, ROC Asset Solutions, LLC., Regency One Capital, LLC. (JD)
September 9, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD)
September 9, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(JD)
September 9, 2020 Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD)
September 8, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Reid Brian Horwitz on behalf of Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (Horwitz, Reid)
September 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Reid Brian Horwitz on behalf of Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (Horwitz, Reid)
September 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher L. Boyd on behalf of State of New York (Boyd, Christopher)
September 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Horwitz, Reid)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection et al v. JPL Recovery Solutions, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regency One Capital, LLC
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Represented By: Andrew M. Debbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Check Security Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott A Croce
Represented By: Colin Marshall Knoer
Represented By: Robert E. Knoer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROC Asset Solutions, LLC.
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Represented By: Andrew M. Debbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc D Gracie
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Represented By: Andrew M. Debbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher L Di Re
Represented By: Richard C. Slisz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keystone Recovery Group, LLC
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Represented By: Andrew M. Debbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian J Koziel
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Represented By: Andrew M. Debbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPL Recovery Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Represented By: Andrew M. Debbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Check Security Associates, LLC
Represented By: Terrence M. Connors
Represented By: Andrew M. Debbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of New York
Represented By: Christopher L. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Consumer Financial Protection Bureau
Represented By: Reid Brian Horwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bureau of Consumer Financial Protection
Represented By: Reid Brian Horwitz
Represented By: Jessica Rank Divine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People of the State of New York
Represented By: Christopher L. Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?