Poston v. Baxter et al
Plaintiff: Monica Poston
Defendant: Wol, Inc., Sharonnda Baxter and William ("Bill") Baxter
Case Number: 1:2020cv01379
Filed: September 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Michael J Roemer
Referring Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 16, 2020 SCHEDULING NOTICE as to #9 MOTION to Strike #8 Answer to Complaint. Responses due by 12/14/2020. Replies due by 1/4/2021. The Court will determine if oral argument is necessary after briefing. (RAZ) Copy of NEF mailed to pro se defendants.
November 10, 2020 Filing 10 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. Michael J. Roemer, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 11/10/2020. (Chambers mailed text referral order to pro se defendants.) (CMD)
November 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Strike #8 Answer to Complaint by Monica Poston.(Hilton, Jonathan)
November 9, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Sharonnda Baxter, William ("Bill") Baxter, Wol, Inc. (JLV)
November 2, 2020 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Sharonnda Baxter, William ("Bill") Baxter, Wol, Inc. (JLV) Copy mailed to pro se defendants.
November 1, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST for Clerk's Entry of Default by Monica Poston against All Defendants. (Hilton, Jonathan)
October 11, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Monica Poston. Sharonnda Baxter served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. (Hilton, Jonathan)
October 11, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Monica Poston. Wol, Inc. served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. (Hilton, Jonathan)
October 11, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Monica Poston. William ("Bill") Baxter served on 10/1/2020, answer due 10/22/2020. (Hilton, Jonathan)
September 28, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Sharonnda Baxter, William Baxter, Wol, Inc. (JD)
September 28, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD)
September 28, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(JD)
September 28, 2020 Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD)
September 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3989947, filed by Monica Poston. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons Form for William Baxter, #3 Exhibit Summons Form for WOL, Inc., #4 Exhibit Summons Form for Sharonnda Baxter)(Hilton, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Poston v. Baxter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wol, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharonnda Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William ("Bill") Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Monica Poston
Represented By: Jonathan Lawrence Hilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?