Marion v. Revco Solutions, Inc.
Plaintiff: Esq. Jeffrey E. Marion and Jeffrey E. Marion
Defendant: REVCO Solutions, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01715
Filed: November 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: William M Skretny
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jeffrey E. Marion (Marion, Jeffrey)
December 17, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Jeffrey E. Marion (Marion, Jeffrey)
December 1, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Revco Solutions, Inc. (JHF)
December 1, 2020 E-Filing Notification: Clerk revised docket text of #2 to "SUMMONS to be issued" to clarify the filing event. (JHF)
November 25, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS to be issued, filed by Jeffrey E. Marion. (Marion, Jeffrey) Modified on 12/1/2020 (JHF).
November 25, 2020 Original summons not submitted. (JD)
November 25, 2020 Case Assigned to Hon. William M. Skretny. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD)
November 25, 2020 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(JD)
November 25, 2020 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD)
November 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Revco Solutions, Inc. $ 400 receipt number 0209-4057710, filed by Jeffrey E. Marion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Marion, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marion v. Revco Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REVCO Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esq. Jeffrey E. Marion
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Marion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey E. Marion
Represented By: Jeffrey E. Marion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?