Caballero v. Fuerzas Armadas Revolucionarias De Coloumbia, et al
Case Number: 1:2020mc00040
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Office: Buffalo Office
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: No cause code entered

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER: The Court invites the United States to submit a brief as amicus curiae to address the questions listed in this order and any other issues raised by this litigation that the United States deems of interest. The Court requests that the United S tates submits a response indicating whether it accepts the invitation by March 18, 2022. If the United States needs additional time to respond, it may request an extension from the Court. If the United States accepts the invitation, this Court will set a briefing schedule. The Clerk of the Court shall serve this order upon the United States Attorney for the Western District of New York. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 3/4/2022. (EK)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 DECISION AND ORDER: The motion for reconsideration or, in the alternative, certification of an interlocutory appeal filed by Terrance P. Flynn and Marcos Daniel Jimenez, Docket Item 81 , is DENIED. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 1/7/2022. (EK)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 DECISION AND ORDER: The motions to substitute counsel, Docket Item 58 , and to waive the local counsel requirement, Docket Item 71 , filed by White & Case are GRANTED; the motion for a stay filed by White & Case, Docket Item 58 , is DENIED; and t he motion for an extension of time filed by Flynn and Jimenez, Docket Item 60 , is DENIED as moot. Attorneys Claire A. DeLelle, Kimberly Anne Havlin, Nicole Erb, and Timothy L. Wilson, Jr., of White & Case LLP are designated as counsel of record fo r PDVSA and the subsidiaries; the Clerk of the Court shall terminate Terrance P. Flynn of Harris Beach LLP and Marcos Daniel Jimenez of Marcos D. Jimenez, P.A., as attorneys of record for PDVSA and the subsidiaries. Within 45 days of the date of this order, PDVSA and the subsidiaries shall brief the factual and legal issues, including whether PDVSA and the subsidiaries are agencies or instrumentalities of FARC; within 30 days of his receipt of that brief, Caballero shall respond or move for discovery; and within 15 days of their receipt of Caballero's response or request for discovery, PDVSA and the subsidiaries shall reply. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 5/11/2021. (MLA)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 TURNOVER JUDGMENT granting the plaintiff's motion for TRIA turnover judgment, Docket Items 23 , 24 . Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 01/29/2021. (MLA)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caballero v. Fuerzas Armadas Revolucionarias De Coloumbia, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?