Gallivan et al v. Cuomo et al
Petitioner: KMT MANAGEMENT, INC., TACO COCINE ELLICOTT, LLC, EXPO MARKET, INC., MCCANS, INC., GERTIES, INC., CRITCHEN, LLC,, MANFURT & TORALTI RESTAURANTS, INC.,, LOCAL GRILLE & CATERING, LLC,, RADCOL, INC., SHOWNY, LLC, 3G ENTERTAINMENT, INC.,, RIZZOS CASA DI ITALIA, INC.,, MY TOMATO PIE, INC.,, SANTORAS PHASE II, LLC,, MARY SANTARINI, THE DEFIELDS CORP, TBF ENTERPRISES, INC.,, D&R KAZ, INC., JMB ENTERPRISES OF ERIE, INC., DON BENOIT, Patrick M. Gallivan, THE HOWLING ROOSTER, LLC,, BOTTOMS UP V, LLC, MIKEYCATIE, INC., TANTALUS, LLC, JOHN DOE CORP.,, SUNNYS DRIVE IN, INC.,, GALLERY EVENTS, LLC, BVPK, INC, GYPSY BOHEMIAN GROVE BAR, INC.,, KITCHEN + BAR ROOM, BILL SHAFLUCAS, LLC, WNY BEER CLUB, LLC, MPR RESTAURANTS WNY, Inc., BUFFALO GRILL N ALE HOUSE, LLC, TACO COCINE HERTEL, LLC, KELLYS KORNER, INC.,, TETON SKY CORP., LYONS, BIGGANE, INC., MAMBRINO KING WINE-COFFEE BAR, LLC, MALBEAT INC, 5111 GENESEE ST., INC, SCOTT A. JARGIELLO, LADY BIRDS RESTAURANTS, LLC, KOOKOOVAYIA, LLC,, COLONIE LOUNGE, INC., DVS PROPERTIES, LLC,, COWBOY OF CHIPPEWA, INC., SMITH BUDUSON, INC., MGPUBLIC, LLC,, GABRIELS GATE, INC.,, LOCAL BUFFALO, LLC,, 23 S. BUFFALO ST., INC., OVERPASS PUB, LLC, BANCHETTI BY RIZZOS, INC., MATILDA BIRD, LLC, ICE HOUSE PUB, LLC, WNY RESTAURANT SYSTEM, DADDY GOO GOO, LLC,, BUFFALOS BEST CATERING, LLC, RAPHAELS CORP., DJ TRIVIA OF WNY, 8444 TRANSIT RD., LLC, SCHWEIS SPRINGER, LLC, WILLIAM JAMES DEVELOPMENT CORP, SUNNYS DRIVE IN TRANSIT, INC.,, THE ORIGINAL PANCAKE HOUSE OF ORCHARD PARK, INC.,, SANTORAS PIZZA PUB AND GRILL, INC.,, CAMPFIRE GRILL II, INC, RUSSELL M. BRAUN, INC., DDF RESTAURANTS, INC., TETON KITCHEN ELMWOOD, DA BADA, INC., CARJONS RESTAURANT GROUP, INC., MUSTANG SALLYS SPIRITS AND GRILL, INC., KFEATHER5, LLC, GRILL N ALE HOUSE, GREEK TO ME RESTAURANT, LLC, 3989 MAIN STREET, INC., PHARAOHS GC, INC.,, STEEL CITY PUB, INC., ALFIERI DUQUIN, INC., RIZOTTO, INC.,, HUTCH & ASSOCIATES, INC.,, TRACY STREET PRODUCTIONS, INC.,, 5786 TRANSIT RD., INC., AMHERST PIZZA & ALE HOUSE, INC.,, A.C. + J RESTAURANT, INC., THE FIRE HOUSE SPORTS BAR & GRILL,, CHICKS RESTAURANT AND LANES, INC.,, SPORTS CITY PIZZA PUB, INC., THE ORIGINAL PANCAKE HOUSE OF WILLIAMSVILLE, INC.,, MKC RESTAURANTS, LLC, 99 BRICK OVEN BAR AND GRILLE, LLC,, TBF Enterprises, Inc., The Original Pancake House of Williamsville, Inc., Bill Shaflucas, LLC., Santoras Phase II, LLC, Kookoovayia, LLC, Rizotto, Inc., Local Buffalo, LLC, Daddy Goo Goo, LLC, Manfurt & Toralti Restaurants, Inc., Malbeat Inc., Critchen, LLC, A.C. + J Restaurant, Inc. doing business as The Peppermill Restaurant, MGpublic, LLC, The Original Pancake House of Orchard Park, Inc., Kellys Korner, Inc., William James Development Corp., The Defields Corp., Santoras Pizza Pub and Grill, Inc., Hutch & Associates, Inc., John Doe Corp., 3G Entertainment, Inc., Sunnys Drive In Tranit, Inc., Amherst Pizza & Ale House, Inc., Rizzos Casa Di Italia, Inc., DVS Properties, LLC, The Fire House Sports Bar & Grill, My Tomato Pie, Inc., 5111 Genesee St., Inc., Gabriels Gate, Inc., Chicks Restaurant And Lanes, Inc., The Howling Rooster, LLC, Pharaohs GC, Inc., Gypsy Bohemian Grove Bar, Inc, Sunnys Drive In, Inc., Tracy Street Productions, Inc., 3989 Main St., Inc., Local Grille & Catering, LLC and 99 Brick Oven Bar and Grille, LLC
Respondent: Andrew M. Cuomo, New York State Department of Health and New York State Liquor Authority
Case Number: 1:2021cv00132
Filed: January 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2021 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER: The plaintiffs' notice of voluntary dismissal without prejudice, Docket Item #3 , is HEREBY SO ORDERED. The Clerk of the Court shall close this case. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 02/01/2021. (MLA)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
January 29, 2021 Filing 6 DECLARATION signed by Christopher L. Boyd re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Second Cause of Action filed by Andrew M. Cuomo, New York State Liquor Authority, New York State Department of Health filed by Andrew M. Cuomo, New York State Liquor Authority, New York State Department of Health. (Boyd, Christopher)
January 28, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Second Cause of Action by 23 S. Buffalo St., Inc., 3989 Main St., Inc., 3G Entertainment, Inc., 5111 Genesee St., Inc., 5786 Transit Rd., Inc., 8444 Transit Rd., LLC, 99 Brick Oven Bar and Grille, LLC, A.C. J Restaurant, Inc., Alfieri Duquin, Inc., Amherst Pizza & Ale House, Inc., BVPK, Inc, Banchetti By Rizzos, Inc., Bill Shaflucas, LLC., Bottoms Up V, LLC, Buffalo Grill N Ale House, LLC, Buffalos Best Catering, LLC, Campfire Grill Ii, Inc, Carjons Restaurant Group, Inc., Chicks Restaurant And Lanes, Inc., Colonie Lounge, Inc., Cowboy Of Chippewa, Inc., Critchen, LLC, D&R Kaz, Inc., DDF Restaurants, Inc., DVS Properties, LLC, Da Bada, Inc., Daddy Goo Goo, LLC, Dj Trivia Of WNY, Don Benoit, Expo Market, Inc., Gabriels Gate, Inc., Gallery Events, LLC, Gerties, Inc., Greek To Me Restaurant, LLC, Grill N Ale House, Gypsy Bohemian Grove Bar, Inc, Ice House Pub, LLC, JMB Enterprises Of Erie, Inc., Scott A. Jargiello, John Doe Corp., KMT Management, Inc., Kellys Korner, Inc., Kfeather5, LLC, Kitchen Bar Room, Kookoovayia, LLC, Lady Birds Restaurants, LLC, Local Buffalo, LLC, Local Grille & Catering, LLC, Lyons, Biggane, Inc., MGpublic, LLC, MKC Restaurants, LLC, MPR Restaurants WNY, Inc., Malbeat Inc., Mambrino King Wine-Coffee Bar, LLC, Manfurt & Toralti Restaurants, Inc., Mary Santarini, Matilda Bird, LLC, McCans, Inc., Mikeycatie, Inc., Mustang Sallys Spirits and Grill, Inc., My Tomato Pie, Inc., Overpass Pub, LLC, Pharaohs GC, Inc., Radcol, Inc., Raphaels Corp., Rizotto, Inc., Rizzos Casa Di Italia, Inc., Russell M. Braun, Inc., Santoras Phase II, LLC, Santoras Pizza Pub and Grill, Inc., Schweis Springer, LLC, Showny, LLC, Smith Buduson, Inc., Sports City Pizza Pub, Inc., Steel City Pub, Inc., Sunnys Drive In Tranit, Inc., Sunnys Drive In, Inc., TBF Enterprises, Inc., Taco Cocine Ellicott, LLC, Taco Cocine Hertel, LLC, Tantalus, LLC, Teton Kitchen Elmwood, Teton Sky Corp., The Defields Corp., The Fire House Sports Bar & Grill, The Howling Rooster, LLC, The Original Pancake House of Orchard Park, Inc., The Original Pancake House of Williamsville, Inc., Tracy Street Productions, Inc., WNY Beer Club, LLC, WNY Restaurant System, William James Development Corp.. Responses due by 1/29/2021. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Corey J. Hogan, Esq.)(Hogan, Corey)
January 27, 2021 E-Filing Notification: Party names were modified and for future reference the attorney should consult the Standard Party Guidelines when opening cases.(JD)
January 26, 2021 Filing 4 Letter filed . (Cohen, Steven)
January 26, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD)
January 26, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(JD)
January 26, 2021 Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD)
January 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by 23 S. BUFFALO ST., INC., 3989 MAIN STREET, INC., 3G ENTERTAINMENT, INC.,, 5111 GENESEE ST., INC, 5786 TRANSIT RD., INC., 8444 TRANSIT RD., LLC, 99 BRICK OVEN BAR AND GRILLE, LLC,, A.C. J RESTAURANT, INC., ALFIERI DUQUIN, INC., AMHERST PIZZA & ALE HOUSE, INC.,, BANCHETTI BY RIZZOS, INC., BILL SHAFLUCAS, LLC, BOTTOMS UP V, LLC, BUFFALO GRILL N ALE HOUSE, LLC, BUFFALOS BEST CATERING, LLC, BVPK, INC, CAMPFIRE GRILL II, INC, CARJONS RESTAURANT GROUP, INC., CHICKS RESTAURANT AND LANES, INC.,, COLONIE LOUNGE, INC., COWBOY OF CHIPPEWA, INC., CRITCHEN, LLC,, D&R KAZ, INC., DA BADA, INC., DADDY GOO GOO, LLC,, DDF RESTAURANTS, INC., DJ TRIVIA OF WNY, DON BENOIT, DVS PROPERTIES, LLC,, EXPO MARKET, INC., GABRIELS GATE, INC.,, GALLERY EVENTS, LLC, GERTIES, INC., GREEK TO ME RESTAURANT, LLC, GRILL N ALE HOUSE, GYPSY BOHEMIAN GROVE BAR, INC.,, Patrick M. Gallivan, HUTCH & ASSOCIATES, INC.,, ICE HOUSE PUB, LLC, JMB ENTERPRISES OF ERIE, INC., JOHN DOE CORP.,, KELLYS KORNER, INC.,, KFEATHER5, LLC, KITCHEN BAR ROOM, KMT MANAGEMENT, INC., KOOKOOVAYIA, LLC,, LADY BIRDS RESTAURANTS, LLC, LOCAL BUFFALO, LLC,, LOCAL GRILLE & CATERING, LLC,, LYONS, BIGGANE, INC., MALBEAT INC, MAMBRINO KING WINE-COFFEE BAR, LLC, MANFURT & TORALTI RESTAURANTS, INC.,, MARY SANTARINI, MATILDA BIRD, LLC, MCCANS, INC., MGPUBLIC, LLC,, MIKEYCATIE, INC., MKC RESTAURANTS, LLC, MPR RESTAURANTS WNY, Inc., MUSTANG SALLYS SPIRITS AND GRILL, INC., MY TOMATO PIE, INC.,, OVERPASS PUB, LLC, PHARAOHS GC, INC.,, RADCOL, INC., RAPHAELS CORP., RIZOTTO, INC.,, RIZZOS CASA DI ITALIA, INC.,, RUSSELL M. BRAUN, INC., SANTORAS PHASE II, LLC,, SANTORAS PIZZA PUB AND GRILL, INC.,, SCHWEIS SPRINGER, LLC, SCOTT A. JARGIELLO, SHOWNY, LLC, SMITH BUDUSON, INC., SPORTS CITY PIZZA PUB, INC., STEEL CITY PUB, INC., SUNNYS DRIVE IN TRANSIT, INC.,, SUNNYS DRIVE IN, INC.,, TACO COCINE ELLICOTT, LLC, TACO COCINE HERTEL, LLC, TANTALUS, LLC, TBF ENTERPRISES, INC.,, TETON KITCHEN ELMWOOD, TETON SKY CORP., THE DEFIELDS CORP, THE FIRE HOUSE SPORTS BAR & GRILL,, THE HOWLING ROOSTER, LLC,, THE ORIGINAL PANCAKE HOUSE OF ORCHARD PARK, INC.,, THE ORIGINAL PANCAKE HOUSE OF WILLIAMSVILLE, INC.,, TRACY STREET PRODUCTIONS, INC.,, WILLIAM JAMES DEVELOPMENT CORP, WNY BEER CLUB, LLC, WNY RESTAURANT SYSTEM (Cohen, Steven)
January 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven M. Cohen on behalf of 23 S. BUFFALO ST., INC., 3989 MAIN STREET, INC., 3G ENTERTAINMENT, INC.,, 5111 GENESEE ST., INC, 5786 TRANSIT RD., INC., 8444 TRANSIT RD., LLC, 99 BRICK OVEN BAR AND GRILLE, LLC,, A.C. J RESTAURANT, INC., ALFIERI DUQUIN, INC., AMHERST PIZZA & ALE HOUSE, INC.,, BANCHETTI BY RIZZOS, INC., BILL SHAFLUCAS, LLC, BOTTOMS UP V, LLC, BUFFALO GRILL N ALE HOUSE, LLC, BUFFALOS BEST CATERING, LLC, BVPK, INC, CAMPFIRE GRILL II, INC, CARJONS RESTAURANT GROUP, INC., CHICKS RESTAURANT AND LANES, INC.,, COLONIE LOUNGE, INC., COWBOY OF CHIPPEWA, INC., CRITCHEN, LLC,, D&R KAZ, INC., DA BADA, INC., DADDY GOO GOO, LLC,, DDF RESTAURANTS, INC., DJ TRIVIA OF WNY, DON BENOIT, DVS PROPERTIES, LLC,, EXPO MARKET, INC., GABRIELS GATE, INC.,, GALLERY EVENTS, LLC, GERTIES, INC., GREEK TO ME RESTAURANT, LLC, GRILL N ALE HOUSE, GYPSY BOHEMIAN GROVE BAR, INC.,, Patrick M. Gallivan, HUTCH & ASSOCIATES, INC.,, ICE HOUSE PUB, LLC, JMB ENTERPRISES OF ERIE, INC., JOHN DOE CORP.,, KELLYS KORNER, INC.,, KFEATHER5, LLC, KITCHEN BAR ROOM, KMT MANAGEMENT, INC., KOOKOOVAYIA, LLC,, LADY BIRDS RESTAURANTS, LLC, LOCAL BUFFALO, LLC,, LOCAL GRILLE & CATERING, LLC,, LYONS, BIGGANE, INC., MALBEAT INC, MAMBRINO KING WINE-COFFEE BAR, LLC, MANFURT & TORALTI RESTAURANTS, INC.,, MARY SANTARINI, MATILDA BIRD, LLC, MCCANS, INC., MGPUBLIC, LLC,, MIKEYCATIE, INC., MKC RESTAURANTS, LLC, MPR RESTAURANTS WNY, Inc., MUSTANG SALLYS SPIRITS AND GRILL, INC., MY TOMATO PIE, INC.,, OVERPASS PUB, LLC, PHARAOHS GC, INC.,, RADCOL, INC., RAPHAELS CORP., RIZOTTO, INC.,, RIZZOS CASA DI ITALIA, INC.,, RUSSELL M. BRAUN, INC., SANTORAS PHASE II, LLC,, SANTORAS PIZZA PUB AND GRILL, INC.,, SCHWEIS SPRINGER, LLC, SCOTT A. JARGIELLO, SHOWNY, LLC, SMITH BUDUSON, INC., SPORTS CITY PIZZA PUB, INC., STEEL CITY PUB, INC., SUNNYS DRIVE IN TRANSIT, INC.,, SUNNYS DRIVE IN, INC.,, TACO COCINE ELLICOTT, LLC, TACO COCINE HERTEL, LLC, TANTALUS, LLC, TBF ENTERPRISES, INC.,, TETON KITCHEN ELMWOOD, TETON SKY CORP., THE DEFIELDS CORP, THE FIRE HOUSE SPORTS BAR & GRILL,, THE HOWLING ROOSTER, LLC,, THE ORIGINAL PANCAKE HOUSE OF ORCHARD PARK, INC.,, THE ORIGINAL PANCAKE HOUSE OF WILLIAMSVILLE, INC.,, TRACY STREET PRODUCTIONS, INC.,, WILLIAM JAMES DEVELOPMENT CORP, WNY BEER CLUB, LLC, WNY RESTAURANT SYSTEM (Cohen, Steven)
January 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Andrew M. Cuomo, New York State Liquor Authority, New York State Department of Health from Erie County Supreme Court, case number 800909/2021. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0209-4123018), filed by Andrew M. Cuomo, New York State Liquor Authority, New York State Department of Health. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Doc. 1 - Petition, #2 Exhibit Doc. 2 - B S.7919, #3 Exhibit Doc. 3 - Executive Order 202.74, #4 Exhibit Doc. 4 - Interim Guidance for Food Services During the COVID-19 Public Health Emergency, #5 Exhibit Doc. 5 - Affidavit of Debra S. Blog, #6 Exhibit Doc. 6 - Affidavit of Paul Santora, #7 Exhibit Doc. 7 - Affidavit of Peter Gerace, #8 Exhibit Doc. 8 - Affidavit of Dave Scrivani, #9 Exhibit Doc. 9 - Affidavit of Greg Duell, #10 Exhibit Doc. 10 - Affidavit of Kevin Casey Mullet, #11 Exhibit Doc. 11 - Affidavit of Mark Hutchinson, #12 Exhibit Doc. 12 - Affidavit of Patrick M. Gallivan, #13 Exhibit Doc. 13 - Executive Order 202.74, #14 Exhibit Doc. 14 - Bill S.7919, #15 Exhibit Doc. 15 - Executive Order 202, #16 Exhibit Doc. 16 - Executive Order 202.60, #17 Exhibit Doc. 17 - Executive Order 202.67, #18 Exhibit Doc. 18 - Executive Order 202.72, #19 Exhibit Doc. 19 - Executive Order 202.79, #20 Exhibit Doc. 20 - Executive Order 202.87, #21 Exhibit Doc. 21 - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED), #22 Exhibit Doc. 22 - RJI -RE ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, #23 Exhibit Doc. 23 - ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A), #24 Exhibit Doc. 24 - Affidavit John Bona III, #25 Exhibit Doc. 25 - Affirmation of Steve M. Cohen, #26 Exhibit Doc. 26 - Affidavit of Michael Mallwitz, #27 Exhibit Doc. 27 - Affidavit of Richard Hamilton, #28 Exhibit Doc. 28 - Affidavit of Brian Russo, #29 Exhibit Doc. 29 - Affidavit of Vasilios Peppes, #30 Exhibit Doc. 30 - Affidavit of Don Benoit, #31 Exhibit Doc. 31 - Affidavit of Roman J. Jewula, #32 Exhibit Doc. 32 - Affidavit of Joel Schreck, #33 Exhibit Doc. 33 - Affidavit of Kimberly Hammerl, #34 Exhibit Doc. 34 - Affidavit of Kathleen Paradowski, #35 Exhibit Doc. 35 - Memorandum of Law, #36 Exhibit List of Filed Documents, #37 Civil Cover Sheet)(Belka, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallivan et al v. Cuomo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KMT MANAGEMENT, INC.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TACO COCINE ELLICOTT, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: EXPO MARKET, INC.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MCCANS, INC.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GERTIES, INC.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CRITCHEN, LLC,
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MANFURT & TORALTI RESTAURANTS, INC.,
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LOCAL GRILLE & CATERING, LLC,
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RADCOL, INC.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SHOWNY, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: 3G ENTERTAINMENT, INC.,
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RIZZOS CASA DI ITALIA, INC.,
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MY TOMATO PIE, INC.,
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SANTORAS PHASE II, LLC,
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MARY SANTARINI
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: THE DEFIELDS CORP
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TBF ENTERPRISES, INC.,
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: D&R KAZ, INC.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JMB ENTERPRISES OF ERIE, INC.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DON BENOIT
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Patrick M. Gallivan
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: THE HOWLING ROOSTER, LLC,
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BOTTOMS UP V, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MIKEYCATIE, INC.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TANTALUS, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOHN DOE CORP.,
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SUNNYS DRIVE IN, INC.,
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GALLERY EVENTS, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BVPK, INC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GYPSY BOHEMIAN GROVE BAR, INC.,
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KITCHEN + BAR ROOM
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BILL SHAFLUCAS, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WNY BEER CLUB, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MPR RESTAURANTS WNY, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BUFFALO GRILL N ALE HOUSE, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TACO COCINE HERTEL, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KELLYS KORNER, INC.,
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TETON SKY CORP.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LYONS, BIGGANE, INC.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MAMBRINO KING WINE-COFFEE BAR, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MALBEAT INC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: 5111 GENESEE ST., INC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SCOTT A. JARGIELLO
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LADY BIRDS RESTAURANTS, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KOOKOOVAYIA, LLC,
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: COLONIE LOUNGE, INC.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DVS PROPERTIES, LLC,
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: COWBOY OF CHIPPEWA, INC.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SMITH BUDUSON, INC.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MGPUBLIC, LLC,
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GABRIELS GATE, INC.,
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: LOCAL BUFFALO, LLC,
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: 23 S. BUFFALO ST., INC.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: OVERPASS PUB, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BANCHETTI BY RIZZOS, INC.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MATILDA BIRD, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ICE HOUSE PUB, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WNY RESTAURANT SYSTEM
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DADDY GOO GOO, LLC,
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: BUFFALOS BEST CATERING, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RAPHAELS CORP.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DJ TRIVIA OF WNY
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: 8444 TRANSIT RD., LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SCHWEIS SPRINGER, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: WILLIAM JAMES DEVELOPMENT CORP
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SUNNYS DRIVE IN TRANSIT, INC.,
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: THE ORIGINAL PANCAKE HOUSE OF ORCHARD PARK, INC.,
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SANTORAS PIZZA PUB AND GRILL, INC.,
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CAMPFIRE GRILL II, INC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RUSSELL M. BRAUN, INC.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DDF RESTAURANTS, INC.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TETON KITCHEN ELMWOOD
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DA BADA, INC.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CARJONS RESTAURANT GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MUSTANG SALLYS SPIRITS AND GRILL, INC.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: KFEATHER5, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GRILL N ALE HOUSE
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: GREEK TO ME RESTAURANT, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: 3989 MAIN STREET, INC.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: PHARAOHS GC, INC.,
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: STEEL CITY PUB, INC.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: ALFIERI DUQUIN, INC.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: RIZOTTO, INC.,
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: HUTCH & ASSOCIATES, INC.,
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TRACY STREET PRODUCTIONS, INC.,
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: 5786 TRANSIT RD., INC.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: AMHERST PIZZA & ALE HOUSE, INC.,
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: A.C. + J RESTAURANT, INC.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: THE FIRE HOUSE SPORTS BAR & GRILL,
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: CHICKS RESTAURANT AND LANES, INC.,
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: SPORTS CITY PIZZA PUB, INC.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: THE ORIGINAL PANCAKE HOUSE OF WILLIAMSVILLE, INC.,
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MKC RESTAURANTS, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: 99 BRICK OVEN BAR AND GRILLE, LLC,
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: TBF Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Original Pancake House of Williamsville, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Bill Shaflucas, LLC.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Santoras Phase II, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kookoovayia, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rizotto, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Local Buffalo, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Daddy Goo Goo, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Manfurt & Toralti Restaurants, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Malbeat Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Critchen, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: A.C. + J Restaurant, Inc. doing business as The Peppermill Restaurant
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MGpublic, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Original Pancake House of Orchard Park, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kellys Korner, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William James Development Corp.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Defields Corp.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Santoras Pizza Pub and Grill, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Hutch & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Doe Corp.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: 3G Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sunnys Drive In Tranit, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Amherst Pizza & Ale House, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rizzos Casa Di Italia, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: DVS Properties, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Fire House Sports Bar & Grill
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: My Tomato Pie, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: 5111 Genesee St., Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gabriels Gate, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Chicks Restaurant And Lanes, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The Howling Rooster, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Pharaohs GC, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gypsy Bohemian Grove Bar, Inc
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Sunnys Drive In, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Tracy Street Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: 3989 Main St., Inc.
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Local Grille & Catering, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: 99 Brick Oven Bar and Grille, LLC
Represented By: Steven M. Cohen
Represented By: Corey J. Hogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Andrew M. Cuomo
Represented By: Ryan Lane Belka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: New York State Department of Health
Represented By: Ryan Lane Belka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: New York State Liquor Authority
Represented By: Ryan Lane Belka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?