Lipkus v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Roger Joseph Lipkus
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2021cv00345
Filed: March 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 25, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Lewis L. Schwartz on behalf of Roger Joseph Lipkus (Schwartz, Lewis)
March 18, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Sixtina Fernandez on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Fernandez, Sixtina)
March 16, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court finds that plaintiff meets the statutory requirements for in forma pauperis status and therefore his motion (Docket # 2) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to file plaintiff's papers without payment of fees. The service of the complaint has been performed in accordance with WDNY Local Rule 5.5. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 3/16/21. (NNR)
March 5, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Attached issued summons and complaint served electronically on the defendant pursuant to Western District of New York's Local Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(JD)
March 5, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD)
March 5, 2021 Case placed in Social Security Assignment Pool. (JD)
March 4, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Roger Joseph Lipkus.(Hiller, Kenneth)
March 4, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Roger Joseph Lipkus. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Notice of Decision-Unfavorable, #2 Exhibit B- Notice of Appeals Council Action, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hiller, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lipkus v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger Joseph Lipkus
Represented By: Kenneth R. Hiller
Represented By: Lewis L. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Sixtina Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?