United States of America v. Paolo Provenzi et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Ikonick Collection LTD, and, Paolo Provenzi and Mohammed Alsaloussi
Case Number: 1:2021cv00398
Filed: March 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah J McCarthy
Referring Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 Filing 22 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 5/13/2021. (CMD)
May 13, 2021 Filing 21 TEXT ORDER: In accordance with today's telephonic conference, the entry of a Case Management Order will be deferred pending resolution of defendant Paolo Provenzi's motion for summary judgment, which shall be filed by June 28, 2021. A conference to set a briefing schedule on that motion is scheduled for July 1, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. This appearance will be held by AT&T teleconference, unless the parties notify my chambers, no later than 24 hours in advance of this proceeding, that all parties have agreed to appear in person. To access the teleconference, the parties shall dial 888-808-6929 and enter access code 1533000#. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 5/13/21. (MDY)
May 13, 2021 Filing 20 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/13/2021. Counsel for the parties appear by telephone. Briefing schedule for defendant Provenzi's proposed motion for summary judgment discussed and set. Text order to follow. Other issues regarding custody and care of subject vehicle discussed. The court instructs the parties to confer and file motions if necessary. APPEARANCES (by video): AUSA Paul Parisi for the government; Adam Levy for defendant Provenzi; Richard O'Neill, John Peterson, Patrick Cline for defendants Ikonick and Alsaloussi (AT&T) (EG)
May 12, 2021 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Answer to Claim to Property and Cross-Claim served on All Appearing Parties on April 28, 2021, filed by Paolo Provenzi. (Levy, Adam)
May 12, 2021 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Answer with Counterclaims and Cross Claims served on All Appearing Parties on April 7, 2021, filed by Paolo Provenzi. (Levy, Adam)
May 5, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ikonick Collection LTD, and, Mohammed Alsaloussi re #14 Answer to Crossclaim (Peterson, John)
May 5, 2021 Filing 16 Letter filed by Paolo Provenzi as to Ikonick Collection LTD, and, Paolo Provenzi, Mohammed Alsaloussi re: Proposed Case Management Order and Intention to Move for Summary Judgment. (Levy, Adam)
April 28, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER to #9 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of Ikonick Collection Ltd. and Mohammed Alsaloussi and by Paolo Provenzi.(Levy, Adam)
April 28, 2021 Filing 14 ANSWER to #10 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim, Counterclaim by Ikonick Collection LTD, and, Mohammed Alsaloussi.(Peterson, John)
April 14, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ikonick Collection LTD, and, Mohammed Alsaloussi re #9 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim (Peterson, John)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: telephonic preliminary pretrial conference set for May 13, 2021 at 10:00 AM before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 4/9/2021. (EG)
April 8, 2021 Filing 11 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER - Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall not hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C), unless further ordered by this Court. All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 4/8/2021. (CMD)
April 7, 2021 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against Mohammed Alsaloussi, Ikonick Collection LTD, and, COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Paolo Provenzi.(Levy, Adam)
April 7, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint , CLAIM TO PROPERTY, and, CROSSCLAIM against Paolo Provenzi by Mohammed Alsaloussi, Ikonick Collection LTD, and.(O'Neill, Richard)
April 6, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Richard F. O'Neill, Esq. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 4/5/2021. (CMD)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
March 29, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Richard F. O'Neill ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4201378.) by Ikonick Collection LTD, and, Mohammed Alsaloussi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-D)(Peterson, John)
March 29, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John M. Peterson on behalf of Ikonick Collection LTD, and, Mohammed Alsaloussi (Peterson, John)
March 24, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint, #4 Certificate of Service, #3 Continuation of Exhibits (Parisi, Paul)
March 18, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(JD)
March 18, 2021 Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JD)
March 18, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JD)
March 17, 2021 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by United States of America re #1 Complaint, #3 Continuation of Exhibits (Parisi, Paul)
March 17, 2021 Filing 3 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #1 Complaint . (Parisi, Paul)
March 17, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul C. Parisi on behalf of United States of America (Parisi, Paul)
March 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INTERPLEADER AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Ikonick Collection LTD, and, Mohammed Alsaloussi, Paolo Provenzi, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Parisi, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Paolo Provenzi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ikonick Collection LTD, and
Represented By: Richard F. O'Neill
Represented By: John M. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paolo Provenzi
Represented By: Adam Michael Levy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammed Alsaloussi
Represented By: Richard F. O'Neill
Represented By: John M. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Paul C. Parisi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?