Nix v. Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Lisa Marie Nix
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv00450
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2021 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court finds that plaintiff meets the statutory requirements for in forma pauperis status and therefore her motion (Docket # 2) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to file plaintiff's papers without payment of fees. The service of the complaint has been performed in accordance with WDNY Local Rule 5.5. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 4/8/21. (NNR)
April 5, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ariella Renee Zoltan on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security Administration (Zoltan, Ariella)
March 30, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. Attached issued summons and complaint served electronically on the defendant pursuant to Western District of New York's Local Rules of Civil Procedure.(Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (LMD) Modified on 3/30/2021 (LMD).
March 30, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (LMD)
March 30, 2021 Case placed in Social Security Assignment Pool. (LMD)
March 29, 2021 Filing 4 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS summons. (Clary, Dennis)
March 29, 2021 Filing 3 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS civil cover sheet. (Clary, Dennis)
March 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Lisa Marie Nix. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Clary, Dennis)
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security Administration, filed by Lisa Marie Nix.(Clary, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nix v. Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Represented By: Ariella Renee Zoltan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Marie Nix
Represented By: Dennis A. Clary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?