Salerno v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Wanda S Salerno
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 1:2021cv00554
Filed: April 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2021 Case opened in District of New Jersey as case 3:21-cv-11704, filed 05/25/2021. (KM)
May 19, 2021 Filing 2 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER to the District of New Jersey. Signed by John W. Nichols,Clerk of the Panel on 5/11/2021. (KM)
April 29, 2021 Clerk notified Multi-District Litigation Panel of potential tag-along case. (BK)
April 29, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (BK)
April 29, 2021 Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. (BK)
April 29, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (BK)
April 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. $ 402 receipt number 0209-4230087, filed by Wanda S Salerno. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goldstein, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salerno v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda S Salerno
Represented By: Brian A. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?