Arce v. Vilardo
Plaintiff: Armando Arce
Defendant: Lawrence J. Vilardo
Case Number: 1:2021cv00588
Filed: May 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: John L Sinatra
Referring Judge: Elizabeth A Wolford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION for permission to file electronically by Armando Arce. (CGJ)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Letter from Armando Arce, dated 5/31/2021, to Honorable Elizabeth A. Wolford. (CGJ)
May 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Case reassigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. (CGJ) Copy of NEF and 3 Text Order mailed to Plaintiff
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER OF RECUSAL: I hereby recuse myself from further involvement in this matter and ask the Clerk of the Court to reassign this matter to another district judge. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 5/10/2021. (KLH)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Remark: Plaintiff has been mailed a pro se packet including a privacy notice, consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge, Pro Se Assistance Program Information and ADR Notification. (CGJ)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(CGJ)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Armando Arce. (CGJ)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lawrence J. Vilardo, filed by Armando Arce. (CGJ)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arce v. Vilardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lawrence J. Vilardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armando Arce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?