S and S Mart Inc v. United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service et al
Plaintiff: S AND S MART INC and S and S Mart Inc.
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service and United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv00589
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 2023
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER OF SETTLEMENT. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 6/25/2021. (CMD)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
May 7, 2021 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER re: notice of withdrawal of motion, Docket Item #5 . The Court accepts the plaintiff's withdrawal of its motion for expedited hearing, stay of administrative decision, temporary restraining order, and preliminary injunction, Docket Item #2 . SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 05/07/2021. (SAV).
May 7, 2021 E-Filing Notification: #5 First MOTION to Withdraw; Modified entry to change to a Notice of Withdraw. (JLV)
May 6, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Withdraw re #2 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order First MOTION to Stay Administrative DecisionFirst MOTION for Hearing First MOTION to Expedite Hearing as Moot by S and S Mart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Modrzynski, Phil) Modified on 5/7/2021 (JLV).
May 6, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Pat Fleming on behalf of United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, United States of America (Fleming, Mary)
May 6, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, United States of America c/o U.S. Attorney. (JLV)
May 6, 2021 Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JLV)
May 6, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JLV)
May 6, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (JLV)
May 5, 2021 Filing 2 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction , First MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , First MOTION to Stay Administrative Decision, First MOTION for Hearing , First MOTION to Expedite Hearing by S AND S MART INC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Copy of Complaint, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Affidavit of Zaid Hussein, #11 List of Witnesses and Exhibits, #12 Text of Proposed Order, #13 Certificate of Service, #14 Certificate of Service)(Modrzynski, Phil)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service, United States of America $ 402 receipt number 0209-4238535, filed by S AND S MART INC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G)(Modrzynski, Phil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: S and S Mart Inc v. United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S AND S MART INC
Represented By: Phil A. Modrzynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S and S Mart Inc.
Represented By: Phil A. Modrzynski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Agriculture, Food and Nutrition Service
Represented By: Mary Pat Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Mary Pat Fleming
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?