Watson et al v. Village of Gowanda et al
Plaintiff: William Watson, Dorothy Watson, Dorothy Myers Watson and William Worden Watson
Defendant: Larry Green, Gary Brecker, Village of Gowanda and Dennis Feldman
Case Number: 1:2021cv00601
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey Crawford
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad A. Davenport on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Davenport, Chad)
June 14, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Gary Brecker, Dennis Feldman, Larry Green, Village of Gowanda.(Naylon, Patrick)
June 1, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelly Ann Geary on behalf of Gary Brecker, Dennis Feldman, Larry Green, Village of Gowanda (Geary, Kelly)
June 1, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer by Gary Brecker, Dennis Feldman, Larry Green, Village of Gowanda. (Naylon, Patrick)
June 1, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick B. Naylon on behalf of Gary Brecker, Dennis Feldman, Larry Green, Village of Gowanda (Naylon, Patrick)
May 27, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dorothy Myers Watson, William Worden Watson. Larry Green served on 5/21/2021, answer due 6/11/2021. (Rupp, R.)
May 14, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Dorothy Myers Watson, William Worden Watson. Gary Brecker served on 5/12/2021, answer due 6/2/2021; Dennis Feldman served on 5/12/2021, answer due 6/2/2021; Village of Gowanda served on 5/12/2021, answer due 6/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service - Gary Brecker, #2 Proof of Service - Dennis Feldman)(Rupp, R.)
May 10, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Gary Brecker, Dennis Feldman, Larry Green, Village of Gowanda. (TF)
May 10, 2021 E-Filing Notification: RE #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants - party names should be entered as they appear on the complaint, Clerk to modify names. No action required. (TF)
May 10, 2021 Case assigned to Hon. Geoffrey Crawford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil opening. (TF)
May 10, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TF)
May 10, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TF)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 402 receipt number 0209-4240570, filed by Dorothy Watson, William Watson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Summons - Village of Gowanda, #3 Exhibit Summons - Dennis Feldman, #4 Exhibit Summons - Larry Green, #5 Exhibit Summons - Gary Brecker)(Rupp, R.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Watson et al v. Village of Gowanda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Watson
Represented By: R. Anthony Rupp, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Watson
Represented By: R. Anthony Rupp, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy Myers Watson
Represented By: R. Anthony Rupp, III
Represented By: Chad A. Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Worden Watson
Represented By: R. Anthony Rupp, III
Represented By: Chad A. Davenport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larry Green
Represented By: Kelly Ann Geary
Represented By: Patrick B. Naylon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Brecker
Represented By: Kelly Ann Geary
Represented By: Patrick B. Naylon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Village of Gowanda
Represented By: Kelly Ann Geary
Represented By: Patrick B. Naylon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Feldman
Represented By: Kelly Ann Geary
Represented By: Patrick B. Naylon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?