Davis v. Norstar, Communities
Plaintiff: Felissa Davis
Defendant: Norstar, Communities
Case Number: 1:2021cv00604
Filed: May 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: John L Sinatra
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Filing 5 JUDGMENT in favor of Norstar, Communities against Felissa Davis. Signed by Mary C. Loewenguth, Clerk of Court on 6/16/2021. (JLV) Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff.
May 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying, without prejudice, #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; that the Plaintiff must submit an amended application for an in forma pauperis status, or tender the requisite filing fee, by June 14, 2021, or the case will be dismissed and the Clerk of Court shall close the case. Signed by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 5/12/2021. (JLV) Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff.
May 7, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Emergency Hearing by Felissa Davis. (JLV)
May 7, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Felissa Davis. (JLV)
May 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Norstar, Communities filed by Felissa Davis. (JLV)
May 7, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (JLV)
May 7, 2021 Plaintiff has been given a pro se packet including a privacy notice, consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge, Pro Se Assistance Program Information, Civil Case Timeline and ADR Notification. (JLV)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Norstar, Communities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norstar, Communities
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felissa Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?