McGrady v. New York State et al
Plaintiff: Gabrielle McGrady
Defendant: Maureen Welch, Genesee Community College, Patty Chaya, State University of New York, New York State, Amy Provenzo and Rafael Alicea-Maldonado
Case Number: 1:2021cv00702
Filed: June 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Summons Issued as to Rafael Alicea-Maldonado, Patty Chaya, Amy Provenzo, State University of New York, Maureen Welch. The Clerks Office has forwarded service packets to the US Marshal. (TMK)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF ADDRESSES by Gabrielle McGrady re 4 Text Order (SG)
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER: On June 9, 2021, this Court granted the plaintiff's, Gabrielle McGrady's, motion to proceed in forma pauperis and ordered "the Clerk of the Court [to] file McGradys papers and cause the United States Marshal to serve" the defendants with the summons and complaint. Docket Item #3 at 2. McGrady has not provided the Court with the defendants' addresses, however. Therefore, within 30 days, McGrady shall provide the Court with the defendants' addresses so that service can be effected. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 6/11/2021. (MLA)(Chambers has mailed a copy of this text order to the pro se plaintiff)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and that the Clerk of Court shall cause the U.S. Marshal to serve copies of the Summons, Complaint and this Order upon the named defendants without plaintiff's payment therefore, unpaid fees to be recovered if this action terminates by monetary award in plaintiff's favor. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 6/8/21. (SG) Plaintiff mailed copy.
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Gabrielle McGrady.(SG)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Rafael Alicea-Maldonado, Patty Chaya, Genesee Community College, New York State, Amy Provenzo, State University of New York, Maureen Welch, filed by Gabrielle McGrady.(SG)
June 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Pro Se Packet Handed to Plaintiff which included: Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, Civil Case Timeline, Pro Se Assistance Program Information and ADR Notification. (SG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGrady v. New York State et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maureen Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genesee Community College
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patty Chaya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State University of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amy Provenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rafael Alicea-Maldonado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabrielle McGrady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?