Ayres v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Heather K. Ayres
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2021cv00733
Filed: June 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2021 Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis filed by Heather K. Ayres. The Court finds that plaintiff meets the statutory requirements for in forma pauperis status and therefore her motion (Docket # 3) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court is directed to file plaintiff's papers without payment of fees. The service of the complaint has been performed in accordance with WDNY Local Rule 5.5. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Frank P. Geraci, Jr. on 6/25/21. (NNR)
June 17, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily Maxine Fishman on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Fishman, Emily)
June 15, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ)
June 15, 2021 Remark: Please see local rule 5.5 and provide original summons to be issued. (CGJ)
June 15, 2021 Case placed in Social Security Assignment Pool. (CGJ)
June 14, 2021 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of New York Northern; Case Number 5:21-cv-00694.
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to District of Western New York: As the Court has been advised that this matter was filed in the incorrect district, it is ordered that this action is hereby transferred to the Western District of New York. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 6/14/2021. (sg) [Transferred from nynd on 6/14/2021.]
June 13, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Heather K. Ayres. (see) [Transferred from nynd on 6/14/2021.]
June 13, 2021 Filing 2 Social Security Identification Form [LODGED] [Pursuant to General Order #18, this document has been electronically lodged with the Court. Viewable by case participants and court personnel only, it is not a filed document, therefore is not available for public inspection. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited]. (see) [Transferred from nynd on 6/14/2021.]
June 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Social Security Appeal. [Pursuant to General Order #18, Section B(3), the CM/ECF system will generate a Notice of Electronic Filing to the USAO-NDNY and Regional Counsel for the Social Security Administration. Service of a Complaint along with the Social Security Identification Form under the Pilot Program will be considered complete only when the three steps in paragraph 3(A), 3(B) and 3(C) of General Order #18 have been completed.] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Copy of Appeals Council Decision, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(see) [Transferred from nynd on 6/14/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ayres v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Emily Maxine Fishman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather K. Ayres
Represented By: B. Brooks Benson
Represented By: Bradford Brooks Benson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?