Wise v. City of Buffalo et al
Plaintiff: Andre Wise
Defendant: Ofc. Shawn McCabe, Lt. Jonathan Pietrzak, Commissioner Byron C Lockwood, City of Buffalo, Ofc. Patrick McDonald, Byron C Lockwood, Patrick J. McDonald, Shawn McCabe and Jonathan Pietrzak
Case Number: 1:2021cv00749
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jeremiah J McCarthy
Referring Judge: William M Skretny
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2021 Filing 9 DISCOVERY PLAN by Andre Wise.(Rumi, Fares)
August 12, 2021 Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: The initial pretrial conference previously scheduled for August 13, 2021 is rescheduled to August 16, 2021 at 4:00 p.m. before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy. The parties may appear by phone with advance notice to chambers. To access the conference, counsel shall dial (888) 808-6929, enter access code 1533000# sufficiently in advance of the conference. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 8/12/2021. (JD)
July 29, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andre Wise. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Aff of service, #2 Affidavit Aff of service, #3 Affidavit Aff of service)(Rumi, Fares)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Conference set for 8/13/2021 at 10:00 AM before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 7/16/2021. (EG)
July 15, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER. Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall not hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C), unless further ordered by this Court. All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 7/15/2021. (JCM)
July 14, 2021 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (JLV)
July 13, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by City of Buffalo, Byron C Lockwood, Shawn McCabe, Patrick J. McDonald, Jonathan Pietrzak. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Huggins, Maeve)
June 18, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to City of Buffalo, Byron C Lockwood, Shawn McCabe, Patrick J. McDonald, Jonathan Pietrzak. (TMK)
June 18, 2021 Case Assigned to Hon. William M. Skretny. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
June 18, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
June 18, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 Original Summons Filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons 2, #2 Summons 3, #3 Summons 4, #4 Summons 5, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rumi, Fares)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT 1 against All Defendants $ 402 receipt number 0209-4279663, filed by Andre Wise.(Rumi, Fares)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wise v. City of Buffalo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ofc. Shawn McCabe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Jonathan Pietrzak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner Byron C Lockwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Buffalo
Represented By: Maeve Eileen Huggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ofc. Patrick McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Byron C Lockwood
Represented By: Maeve Eileen Huggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick J. McDonald
Represented By: Maeve Eileen Huggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn McCabe
Represented By: Maeve Eileen Huggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan Pietrzak
Represented By: Maeve Eileen Huggins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andre Wise
Represented By: Fares A. Rumi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?