Meadows v. Department of Veterans Affairs et al
Plaintiff: Carolette Meadows
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs, Manola Demunda, Rana Samuel, Benjamin Nickle and Veterans Affairs Western New York Health Care System (VA)
Case Number: 1:2021cv00769
Filed: June 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Filing 5 RIGHT TO SUE NOTICE by Carolette Meadows. (CGJ)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying #2 Motion to Appoint Counsel as premature ; granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; that within 45 days of the date of this order, plaintiff may amend her complaint; that is plaintiff does not amend her complaint correcting the deficiencies within 45 days of the date of this order, the complaint will be dismissed without further order and the Clerk of Court shall close the case; that plaintiff shall notify the Court in writing if her address changes. The Court may dismiss the action if plaintiff fails to do so. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 7/12/2021. (JLV) Copy mailed to pro se plaintiff.
June 28, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (JLV)
June 25, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Carolette Meadows. (JLV)
June 25, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Carolette Meadows. (JLV)
June 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Manola Demunda, Department of Veterans Affairs, Benjamin Nickle, Rana Samuel, Veterans Affairs Western New York Health Care System (VA), filed by Carolette Meadows. (JLV)
June 25, 2021 Plaintiff has been given a pro se packet including a privacy notice, consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge, Civil Case Timeline, Pro Se Assistance Program Information and ADR Notification. (JLV)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meadows v. Department of Veterans Affairs et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolette Meadows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manola Demunda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rana Samuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Benjamin Nickle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veterans Affairs Western New York Health Care System (VA)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?