J.B. v. Chautauqua County et al
Plaintiff: J.B.
Defendant: Chautauqua County and Does 1-10
Case Number: 1:2021cv00786
Filed: July 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2021 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(SG)
August 9, 2021 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Chautauqua County.(O'Neill, Shannon)
July 13, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
July 13, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
July 13, 2021 Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
July 12, 2021 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Chautauqua County. to #1 Notice of Removal, Index of Documents Filed with State Court filed by Chautauqua County. (McClaren, Michael)
July 9, 2021 E-Filing Notification: re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL - Attorney is directed to e-file an Index identifying each document filed and/or served in the state court action using the Continuation of Exhibits event found under Responses and Replies. (TMK)
July 8, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Chautauqua County from Chautauqua County Supreme Court, case number EK12021000938. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0209-4296169), filed by Chautauqua County. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Document List, #3 Certificate of Compliance, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Certificate of Service)(McClaren, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.B. v. Chautauqua County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.B.
Represented By: Jeff Herman
Represented By: Scott Michael Duquin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chautauqua County
Represented By: Michael P. McClaren
Represented By: Shannon Brae O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?