Hunt v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Plaintiff: Michael D Hunt, Individually and as Administrator of the Estate of Sarah B. Hunt (Deceased) and Michael D. Hunt
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00800
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey Crawford
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER to the District of New Jersey. Signed by John W. Nichols,Clerk of the Panel on 7/27/2021. KM) Modified on 7/28/2021 (KM)
July 28, 2021 E-Filing Notification regarding #2 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. Entry modified to remove Judge Crawford's name as the signee. (KM)
July 28, 2021 Case transferred to District of New Jersey as case 3:21-cv-14235, filed 07/28/2021. (KM)
July 14, 2021 Notified Multi-District Litigation Panel of potential tag-along case. (TMK)
July 14, 2021 Original Summons Not Submitted (TMK)
July 14, 2021 Case Assigned to Hon. Geoffrey Crawford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
July 14, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
July 14, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. $ 402 receipt number 0209-4301442, filed by Michael D Hunt, Individually and as Administrator of the Estate of Sarah B. Hunt (Deceased). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A: Letters of Administration)(Goldstein, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hunt v. Johnson & Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D Hunt, Individually and as Administrator of the Estate of Sarah B. Hunt (Deceased)
Represented By: Brian A. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael D. Hunt
Represented By: Brian A. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?