Walker v. Target Corporation
Plaintiff: kyle M walker, Male and Kyle M. Walker
Defendant: Target Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv00801
Filed: July 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: H Kenneth Schroeder
Referring Judge: William M Skretny
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2021 Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Mandatory Disclosures due by 9/30/2021; Stipulation of Selection of Mediator due by 9/30/2021; First Mediation Session due by 11/19/2021; Motions to Join Parties/Amend Pleadings due by 12/17/2021; Plaintiff Expert Witness ID due by 6/24/2022; Defendant Expert Witness ID due by 7/25/2022; Discovery completed by 9/16/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 10/14/2022. If no dispositive motions are filed, a Status Conference is set for 10/18/2022 at 11:00 AM before the Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. Mediation To End by 11/4/2022. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 8/24/2021. (LMG)
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 Proposed Pretrial Order Scheduling Order by Target Corporation. (Briandi, Jody)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER regarding issuance of Case Management Order. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 7/19/21. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Order Form, #2 Consent Memorandum, #3 Consent Form)(LMG)
July 15, 2021 Filing 4 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER. Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder, Jr., United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall not hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C), unless further ordered by this Court. All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 7/15/2021. (JCM)
July 14, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
July 14, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
July 14, 2021 Case Assigned to Hon. William M. Skretny. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
July 13, 2021 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Target Corporation. (Briandi, Jody)
July 13, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Target Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Target Corporation for Target Corporation.. (Briandi, Jody)
July 13, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Target Corporation from Niagara, case number E174945/2021. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0209-4301444), filed by Target Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Index of Pleadings, #3 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #4 Exhibit Defendant's Answer, #5 Exhibit Defendant's Demand for Relief, #6 Exhibit Plaintiff's Response to Demand for Relief)(Briandi, Jody)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Target Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: kyle M walker, Male
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle M. Walker
Represented By: Brian R Wood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Target Corporation
Represented By: Jody E. Briandi
Represented By: Anastasia Marie McCarthy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?