Taber et al v. WAL-MART, INC. et al
Plaintiff: Marie Taber and Scott Taber
Defendant: WAL-MART, INC., Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Realty Company, Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Case Number: 1:2021cv00859
Filed: July 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Michael J Roemer
Referring Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Filing 12 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.)Stipulation of Selection of Mediator due by 9/17/2021. Mandatory Disclosures due by 10/1/2021. Motions to Join Parties/Amend Pleadings due by 11/1/2021. First Mediation Session due by 11/15/2021. Motions to Compel Discovery due by 4/15/2022. Discovery completed by 5/13/2022. Plaintiff Expert Witness ID due by 6/15/2022. Defendant Expert Witness ID due by 7/15/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 10/31/2022. Mediation To End by 10/31/2022. Signed by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 9/8/2021. (RAZ)
September 2, 2021 Filing 11 DISCOVERY PLAN by WAL-MART, INC., Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Realty Company, Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Will, Pauline)
September 1, 2021 Filing 10 TEXT ORDER. The parties are hereby directed to jointly complete and email to chambers at roemer@nywd.uscourts.gov, the attached case management order. Such shall be completed within 30 days of the date of this Text Order. The Court will issue a final case management order upon receipt and review of the proposed deadlines. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 9/1/2021. (RAZ)
August 30, 2021 Filing 9 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER - Hon. Michael J. Roemer, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall not hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C), unless further ordered by this Court. All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 8/30/2021. (CMD)
August 19, 2021 Filing 8 Stipulation-Selection of Mediator by WAL-MART, INC., Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Realty Company, Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Will, Pauline)
August 19, 2021 Filing 7 DISCOVERY PLAN by WAL-MART, INC., Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust, Wal-Mart Realty Company, Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP.(Will, Pauline)
July 29, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Realty Company. (Will, Pauline)
July 29, 2021 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust. (Will, Pauline)
July 29, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Will, Pauline)
July 29, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.. (Will, Pauline)
July 29, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by WAL-MART, INC.. (Will, Pauline)
July 28, 2021 Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
July 28, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
July 28, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
July 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Erie County Supreme Court, case number 803590/2021. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0209-4314295), filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit Ex. A, #3 Exhibit Ex. B, #4 Exhibit Ex. C, #5 Exhibit Ex. D, #6 Exhibit Ex. E, #7 Exhibit Ex. F, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Will, Pauline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taber et al v. WAL-MART, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie Taber
Represented By: Scott M. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Taber
Represented By: Scott M. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WAL-MART, INC.
Represented By: Pauline Costanzo Will
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Real Estate Business Trust
Represented By: Pauline Costanzo Will
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Realty Company
Represented By: Pauline Costanzo Will
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, Inc.
Represented By: Pauline Costanzo Will
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Pauline Costanzo Will
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Schulz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?