Ganey v. St. Alphonsus Roman Catholic Church and School et al
Plaintiff: Richard Ganey
Defendant: ST. ALPHONSUS ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH, SCHOOL a/k/a HOLY FAMILY CHURCH OF AUBURN NY, ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF ROCHESTER, St. Alphonsus Roman Catholic Church and School and Holy Family Church of Auburn NY
Case Number: 1:2021cv00905
Filed: August 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: William M Skretny
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Roman Catholic Diocese of Rochester Pastoral Center on 08/19/2021, filed by Richard Ganey. (Vona, Keith)
August 25, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal of defendant, The Diocese of Rochester by Richard Ganey. (Vona, Keith)
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on St. Alphonsus Roman Catholic Church and School on 08/17/2021, filed by Richard Ganey. (Vona, Keith)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 TEXT ORDER -- IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that Daniel C. Levin's #4 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 8/19/2021. (JCM)
August 18, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Daniel C. Levin, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0209-4335035.) by Richard Ganey. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Keith R. Vona, Esq., #2 Exhibit Admission Petition, #3 Exhibit Admission Sponsor Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Attorney's Oath, #5 Exhibit Civility Principles and Guidelines Oath, #6 Exhibit Attorney Database and Electronic Case Filing Registration)(Vona, Keith)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Roman Catholic Diocese of Rochester, St. Alphonsus Roman Catholic Church and School. (TMK)
August 11, 2021 Case Assigned to Hon. William M. Skretny. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
August 11, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
August 11, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
August 10, 2021 Filing 2 Original Summons Filed. (Vona, Keith)
August 10, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 402 receipt number 0209-4328417, filed by Richard Ganey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vona, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ganey v. St. Alphonsus Roman Catholic Church and School et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Ganey
Represented By: Keith R. Vona
Represented By: Daniel C. Levin
Represented By: Daniel Levin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ST. ALPHONSUS ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SCHOOL a/k/a HOLY FAMILY CHURCH OF AUBURN NY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ROMAN CATHOLIC DIOCESE OF ROCHESTER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Alphonsus Roman Catholic Church and School
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holy Family Church of Auburn NY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?