Karl et al v. Dimes Energy, LP et al
Plaintiff: Jacob R Karl, Agnes E Karl and The Bob and Dody Karl Trust
Defendant: Dimes Energy, LP, Dimes Energy, GP, Inc., Duffy, Inc. and Virginia R Thropp
Case Number: 1:2021cv01057
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey Crawford
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 33 U.S.C. ยง 1365
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2021 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Copy of Complaint under 42 U.S.C. 6972(b)(2)(F) via Certified Mail/Return Receipt Requested served on US Attorney for the Western District of New York; Merrick Garland, Attorney General of the United States; NYS Dept of Environmental Conservation-Region 9; Michael S. Reagan, Administrator, Environmental Protection Agency and United States Attorney's Office on 11/16/2021, filed by Agnes E Karl, Jacob R Karl. (Murphy, Kevin)
November 16, 2021 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM)
November 10, 2021 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dimes Energy, GP, Inc.. Dimes Energy, GP, Inc. waiver sent on 11/1/2021, answer due 1/3/2022. (Murphy, Kevin)
November 10, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Dimes Energy, LP. Dimes Energy, LP waiver sent on 11/1/2021, answer due 1/3/2022. (Murphy, Kevin)
October 28, 2021 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint (initiating papers) served on Virginia R. Thropp on October 13, 2021, filed by Agnes E Karl, Jacob R Karl. (Murphy, Kevin)
October 25, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , CROSSCLAIM against Dimes Energy, GP, Inc., Dimes Energy, LP, Virginia R Thropp by Duffy, Inc..(Weber, Cory)
October 15, 2021 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Duffy, Inc. (upon Pennsylvania Department of State) on Otober 6, 2021, filed by Agnes E Karl, Jacob R Karl. (Murphy, Kevin)
October 15, 2021 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on Duffy, Inc. (personal) on October 3, 2021, filed by Agnes E Karl, Jacob R Karl. (Murphy, Kevin)
September 29, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dimes Energy, GP, Inc., Dimes Energy, LP, Duffy, Inc., Virginia R Thropp. (TMK)
September 29, 2021 Case Assigned to Hon. Geoffrey Crawford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
September 29, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
September 29, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
September 28, 2021 Filing 2 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Agnes E Karl, Jacob R Karl, The Bob and Dody Karl Trust. to #1 Complaint, filed by Agnes E Karl, Jacob R Karl, The Bob and Dody Karl Trust. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Murphy, Kevin)
September 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 402 receipt number 0209-4373319, filed by Jacob R Karl, The Bob and Dody Karl Trust, Agnes E Karl. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-RCRA Citizen Suit Notice Letter 06.16.2021)(Murphy, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Karl et al v. Dimes Energy, LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob R Karl
Represented By: Kevin C. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Agnes E Karl
Represented By: Kevin C. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Bob and Dody Karl Trust
Represented By: Kevin C. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dimes Energy, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dimes Energy, GP, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duffy, Inc.
Represented By: Cory John Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia R Thropp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?