Kollidas et al v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Raymond Kollidas and Rosanna Kollidas
Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv01126
Filed: October 15, 2021
Court: U.S. District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION TO BE SO ORDERED by Raymond Kollidas, Rosanna Kollidas. (Gillen, Patricia)
November 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER re #8 stipulation to extend the plaintiffs' time to respond to the defendant's demand for the complaint, Docket Item #7 . The stipulation is ordered. The plaintiffs' response to the defendant's demand for the complaint is due by 12/10/2021. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 11/12/2021. (EK)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION TO BE SO ORDERED by Raymond Kollidas, Rosanna Kollidas. (Gillen, Patricia)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE by The Cincinnati Insurance Company of Demand for the Complaint (Vahey, Laurie)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Cincinnati Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Cincinnati Financial Corporation for The Cincinnati Insurance Company.. (Leavy, Patrick)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick D.R. Leavy on behalf of The Cincinnati Insurance Company (Leavy, Patrick)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia Gillen on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Gillen, Patricia)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE by The Cincinnati Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Index of State Court Documents (Vahey, Laurie)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order E-Filing Notification: re #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL. Action Required: Attorney is directed to file an index identifying State Court documents pursuant to local rule 81(A). (CGJ)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Case assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (CGJ)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(CGJ)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Cincinnati Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal, (Vahey, Laurie)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Cincinnati Insurance Company from Erie County Supreme Court, case number 812758/2021. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0209-4391147), filed by The Cincinnati Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vahey, Laurie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kollidas et al v. The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Kollidas
Represented By: John F. Maxwell
Represented By: Patricia Gillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosanna Kollidas
Represented By: John F. Maxwell
Represented By: Patricia Gillen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Cincinnati Insurance Company
Represented By: Laurie A. Vahey
Represented By: Patrick D.R. Leavy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?