Brown v. Dollar General Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Andrea Brown
Defendant: Dollar General Corporation and Matrix Absence Management
Case Number: 1:2021cv01151
Filed: October 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: H Kenneth Schroeder
Referring Judge: John L Sinatra
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 7, 2021 Filing 11 TEXT ORDER re #10 Consent to Arbitration. If Plaintiff is not appearing pro se in this case, then her counsel must sign the filing on her behalf. See L.R. Civ. P. 83.1 and 83.2. SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 12/7/2021. (Copy mailed to Attorney Paul S. Grosswald.) (KLH)
December 6, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT to Arbitration by Dollar General Corporation, Matrix Absence Management (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Simons, Adam)
November 3, 2021 Filing 9 TEXT ORDER re #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay All Proceedings Pending Arbitration MOTION to Stay filed by Matrix Absence Management, Dollar General Corporation: Responses due by 12/3/2021., Replies due by 12/17/2021. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 11/3/2021. (KER)
November 2, 2021 E-Filing Notification: re #8 Modified to add Motion to Stay. (CGJ)
November 1, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay All Proceedings Pending Arbitration by Dollar General Corporation, Matrix Absence Management. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Declaration of Mia Savaloja, #3 Declaration of Debbie Roach, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C)(Simons, Adam). Added MOTION to Stay on 11/2/2021 (CGJ).
November 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER regarding issuance of Case Management Order. Signed by Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr. on 11/1/21. (Attachments: #1 Case Management Order Form, #2 Consent Memorandum, #3 Consent Form)(LMG)
November 1, 2021 Filing 6 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. H. Kenneth Schroeder Jr., United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 11/1/2021. (KLH)
October 27, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (CGJ)
October 27, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(CGJ)
October 27, 2021 Case assigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (CGJ)
October 26, 2021 Filing 5 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Dollar General Corporation, Matrix Absence Management. Index Identifying State Court Documents filed by Dollar General Corporation, Matrix Absence Management. (Simons, Adam)
October 26, 2021 Filing 4 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Dollar General Corporation, Matrix Absence Management. Civil Cover Sheet filed by Dollar General Corporation, Matrix Absence Management. (Simons, Adam)
October 26, 2021 E-Filing Notification: re #1 Action Required: Attorney is directed to file an index identifying State Court documents pursuant to local rule 81(A). (CGJ)
October 26, 2021 E-Filing Notification: Attorney is directed to file a civil cover sheet, pursuant to Local Rule 3. No judge assignment will be made until filing is entered on the docket. Please utilize the Continuation of Exhibits event, located within the Responses and Replies category. (CGJ)
October 25, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Matrix Absence Management identifying Corporate Parent Delphi Financial Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Tokyo Marine Holdings, Inc for Matrix Absence Management.. (Simons, Adam)
October 25, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Dollar General Corporation. (Simons, Adam)
October 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Matrix Absence Management, Dollar General Corporation from Supreme Court of the State of New York, case number 9000588. (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0209-4400130), filed by Matrix Absence Management, Dollar General Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Stipulation Extending Time to Respond to Complaint, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Christine Mantel, #4 Exhibit Declaration of Kelly Collier)(Simons, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Dollar General Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Brown
Represented By: Paul S. Grosswald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar General Corporation
Represented By: Adam T. Simons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matrix Absence Management
Represented By: Adam T. Simons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?