Southwestern Central School District Board of Education et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Southwestern Central School District Board of Education and Rochester City School District Board of Education
Defendant: McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey Holdings, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States and McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington D.C.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01286
Filed: December 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2022 Case transferred to Northern District California as case 3:22-cv-00086, filed on 01/07/2022. (KM)
January 4, 2022 Filing 5 MULTIDISTRICT CONDITIONAL LITIGATION TRANSFER ORDER to the Northern District of California. Signed by John W. Nichols,Clerk of the Panel on 1/4/2022. (KM)
December 20, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington D.C., McKinsey Holdings, Inc. (TMK)
December 20, 2021 Notified Multi-District Litigation Panel of potential tag-along case. (TMK)
December 20, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
December 20, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
December 20, 2021 Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
December 17, 2021 Filing 3 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Rochester City School District Board of Education, Southwestern Central School District Board of Education. to #1 Complaint, Amended Civil Cover Sheet filed by Rochester City School District Board of Education, Southwestern Central School District Board of Education. (Kristoff, Karl)
December 16, 2021 Filing 2 Letter filed by Rochester City School District Board of Education, Southwestern Central School District Board of Education as to McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington D.C., McKinsey Holdings, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States . (Kristoff, Karl)
December 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against McKinsey & Company, Inc., McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States, McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington D.C., McKinsey Holdings, Inc. $ 402 receipt number 0209-4446438, filed by Southwestern Central School District Board of Education, Rochester City School District Board of Education. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Kristoff, Karl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Southwestern Central School District Board of Education et al v. McKinsey & Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southwestern Central School District Board of Education
Represented By: Karl W. Kristoff
Represented By: Andrew J. Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochester City School District Board of Education
Represented By: Karl W. Kristoff
Represented By: Andrew J. Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company, Inc. United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKinsey & Company, Inc. Washington D.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?