Kowal et al v. Hooker & Holcombe, Inc et al
Plaintiff: Cassandre Kowal and Samantha Keller
Defendant: Hooker & Holcombe, Inc, Hooker & Holcombe Retirement Services, Inc., Hooker & Holcombe Investment Advisors, Inc., Pension Plan A of HealthNow New York, Inc., HealthNow New York, Inc. d/b/a BlueCross BlueShield of Western New York k/n/a Highmark Western and Northeastern New York, Inc. and Healthnow New York, Inc. doing business as BlueCross BlueShield of Western New York Now known as Highmark Western and Northeastern New York, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01299
Filed: December 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2022 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Healthnow New York, Inc., Pension Plan A of HealthNow New York, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Weissflach)(Weissflach, Robert)
February 18, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J. Manna on behalf of Hooker & Holcombe Investment Advisors, Inc., Hooker & Holcombe Retirement Services, Inc., Hooker & Holcombe, Inc (Manna, Joseph)
January 25, 2022 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cassandre Kowal, Samantha Keller. Hooker & Holcombe Investment Advisors, Inc. waiver sent on 12/23/2021, answer due 2/22/2022; Hooker & Holcombe Retirement Services, Inc. waiver sent on 12/23/2021, answer due 2/22/2022. (Walsh, Gerald)
January 25, 2022 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Samantha Keller. Healthnow New York, Inc. waiver sent on 12/23/2021, answer due 2/22/2022. (Walsh, Gerald)
December 22, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Healthnow New York, Inc., Hooker & Holcombe Investment Advisors, Inc., Hooker & Holcombe Retirement Services, Inc., Hooker & Holcombe, Inc, Pension Plan A of HealthNow New York, Inc. (TMK)
December 22, 2021 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
December 22, 2021 Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
December 22, 2021 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
December 21, 2021 Filing 2 Original Summons Filed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Hooker & Holcombe Investment Advisors, Inc, #3 Summons Hooker & Holcombe Retirement Services, Inc., #4 Summons Pension Plan A HealthNow New York, Inc., #5 Summons HealthNow New York Inc.)(Walsh, Gerald)
December 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HealthNow New York, Inc. d/b/a BlueCross BlueShield of Western New York k/n/a Highmark Western and Northeastern New York, Inc., Hooker & Holcombe Investment Advisors, Inc., Hooker & Holcombe Retirement Services, Inc., Hooker & Holcombe, Inc, Pension Plan A of HealthNow New York, Inc. $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4453774, filed by Cassandre Kowal, Samantha Keller.(Walsh, Gerald)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kowal et al v. Hooker & Holcombe, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cassandre Kowal
Represented By: Gerald T. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Keller
Represented By: Gerald T. Walsh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hooker & Holcombe, Inc
Represented By: Joseph J. Manna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hooker & Holcombe Retirement Services, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph J. Manna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hooker & Holcombe Investment Advisors, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph J. Manna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pension Plan A of HealthNow New York, Inc.
Represented By: Robert C. Weissflach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HealthNow New York, Inc. d/b/a BlueCross BlueShield of Western New York k/n/a Highmark Western and Northeastern New York, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Healthnow New York, Inc. doing business as BlueCross BlueShield of Western New York Now known as Highmark Western and Northeastern New York, Inc.
Represented By: Robert C. Weissflach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?