Phillips v. First UNUM Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Michelyn Phillips
Defendant: First UNUM Life Insurance Company and The Community Action Organization of Western New York, Inc
Case Number: 1:2022cv00130
Filed: February 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Leslie G Foschio
Referring Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER. Scheduling Conference set for 5/17/2022 03:00 PM before Hon. Leslie G. Foschio. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 4/7/2022. (SDW)Teleconference Instructions: Conference telephone number: 1-877-810-9415, access code: 1298279#
April 4, 2022 Filing 9 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER - Hon. Leslie G. Foschio, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall not hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C), unless further ordered by this Court. All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 4/4/2022. (CMD)
April 4, 2022 ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
April 4, 2022 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM)
April 1, 2022 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by First UNUM Life Insurance Company.(Miller, Matthew)
March 28, 2022 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by The Community Action Organization of Western New York, Inc. (Zawodzinski, James)
March 28, 2022 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: All Corporate Disclosure Statements pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1(b) are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM)
March 23, 2022 Filing 6 TEXT ORDER re #5 Stipulation Extending the Time to Respond. The time for defendant Community Action Organization of Western New York, Inc., to answer, move against, or otherwise respond to the plaintiff's complaint is extended until 5/13/2022. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 3/23/2022. (EK)
March 22, 2022 Filing 5 STIPULATION Extending Defendant, the Community Action Organization of Western New York, Inc.'s, time to answer or otherwise appear through May 13, 2022 by The Community Action Organization of Western New York, Inc. (Zawodzinski, James)
March 22, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by James Jude Zawodzinski on behalf of The Community Action Organization of Western New York, Inc (Zawodzinski, James)
March 11, 2022 Filing 3 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, Service through NYS Dept of Financial Services Acknowledgement filed by Michelyn Phillips. (Pfaff, E.)
February 14, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to First UNUM Life Insurance Company and The Community Action Organization of Western New York, Inc. (RE)
February 14, 2022 Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo added. (RE)
February 14, 2022 Case Assigned to Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (RE)
February 14, 2022 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(RE)
February 14, 2022 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (RE)
February 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4500203, filed by Michelyn Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh 1 Demand for Plan Documents, #2 Exhibit Exh 2 Demand for Plan Documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit Proposed Summons for Unum, #5 Exhibit Proposed Summons for Community Action)(Pfaff, E.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. First UNUM Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelyn Phillips
Represented By: E. Peter Pfaff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First UNUM Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Matthew D. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Community Action Organization of Western New York, Inc
Represented By: James Jude Zawodzinski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?