Graesser v. LoVallo et al
Plaintiff: Jodi Graesser
Defendant: Sharon M. LoVallo, Howard Von Rensselaer., Sr., Marie Cannon and Howard VanRensselaer, Sr.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00320
Filed: April 27, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2022 Filing 4 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jodi Graesser. (JLV)
May 10, 2022 Remark: Mailed a copy of order #3, original complaint, a blank non-prisoner complaint form, and the instructions for preparing an amended complaint to Jodi Graesser. (TMK)
May 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Graesser's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, Docket Item #2 , is granted. Graesser's claims for injunctive relief asking this Court to intervene in an ongoing state-court custody proceeding are DISMISSED. Graesser may amend her complaint within 45 days of the date of this order. The Clerk of Court shall send to Graesser with this order a copy of the original complaint, a blank non-prisoner complaint form, and the instructions for preparing an amended complaint. If Graesser does not file an amended complaint within 45 days of the date of this order, her claims against Chairman VanRensselaer and Commissioner Cannon will be dismissed without further order and the Clerk of Court shall terminate Chairman VanRensselaer and Commissioner Cannon as defendants to this action. In addition, unless within 45 days of the date of this order an attorney enters an appearance to represent Graesser's son and files an amended complaint naming Graesser's son as a plaintiff, her son's ADA claims will be dismissed without prejudice without further order. If Graesser does not file an amended complaint within 45 days of the date of this order, the Clerk of Court shall cause the United States Marshals Service to serve copies of the summons, complaint, and this order upon defendant Judge LoVallo, without the plaintiff's payment therefor, unpaid fees to be recoverable if this action terminates by monetary award in the plaintiff's favor. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 5/6/2022. (EK)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-
April 27, 2022 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jodi Graesser.(KM)
April 27, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jodi Graesser. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KM)
April 27, 2022 Plaintiff given Pro Se Packet which included: Privacy Notice, Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge, Civil Case Timeline, Pro Se Assistance Program Information and the ADR Plan. (KM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Graesser v. LoVallo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodi Graesser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sharon M. LoVallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Von Rensselaer., Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marie Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard VanRensselaer, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?