Armusewicz et al v. Independent Health Association, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Leah Armusewicz, Drew T. Armusewicz and Leah Lasher
Defendant: Independent Health Association, Inc. and Independent Health Benefits Corporation, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2022cv00432
Filed: June 7, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Leslie G Foschio
Referring Judge: John L Sinatra
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER. Each party, including any party appearing for themselves without counsel, shall provide to the court, either jointly or separately, a proposed case management order not later than 9/7/2022 for the purpose of entry of a case management order as required by Fed.R.Civ.P. 16(b). Upon receipt of the proposed case management orders, a Scheduling Order will be prepared and filed by the court. Signed by Hon. Leslie G. Foschio on 7/29/2022. (SDW)
July 29, 2022 Filing 7 TEXT REFERRAL ORDER (DISPOSITIVE) - Hon. Leslie G. Foschio, United States Magistrate Judge, is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 7/29/2022. (KLH)
July 28, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Tracey B. Scarpello on behalf of Independent Health Association, Inc., Independent Health Benefits Corporation, Inc. (Scarpello, Tracey)
July 28, 2022 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Independent Health Association, Inc., Independent Health Benefits Corporation, Inc.. (Roney, Susan)
July 28, 2022 Filing 4 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, by Independent Health Association, Inc., Independent Health Benefits Corporation, Inc..(Roney, Susan)
June 8, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE: All parties are expected to comply with Judge Sinatra's individual requirements set forth in the "Judges' Info" section of the Court's website. Business organization parties should pay particular attention to the tab relating to such parties. (KLH)
June 8, 2022 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Independent Health Association, Inc., Independent Health Benefits Corporation, Inc. (TMK)
June 8, 2022 Case Assigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)
June 8, 2022 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
June 8, 2022 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
June 7, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint against Independent Health Association, Inc., Independent Health Benefits Corporation, Inc. $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4597577, filed by Leah Armusewicz, Drew T. Armusewicz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit B to K to Verified Complaint, #3 Exhibit L to Q to Verified Complaint, #4 Summons - Independent Health Association, Inc., #5 Summons - Independent Health Benefits Corporation, Inc., #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cohen, Frederick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armusewicz et al v. Independent Health Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Armusewicz
Represented By: Frederick B. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Drew T. Armusewicz
Represented By: Frederick B. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Lasher
Represented By: Frederick B. Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independent Health Association, Inc.
Represented By: Susan C. Roney
Represented By: Tracey B. Scarpello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independent Health Benefits Corporation, Inc.
Represented By: Susan C. Roney
Represented By: Tracey B. Scarpello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?