ACV Auctions, Inc. v. National Auto Auction Association, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: ACV Auctions, Inc.
Defendant: National Auto Auction Association, Inc., Auto Auction Services Corporation, Manheim Auctions Inc., ADESA US Auction, LLC, ADESA, Inc., ServNet Auction Group and Independent Auto Auction Services Corporation d/b/a Independent Auction Group
Case Number: 1:2022cv00649
Filed: August 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Geoffrey Crawford
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 15 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 8, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER granting #79 MOION for Pro Hac Vice for Jay A. Jurata. Signed by Hon. Geoffrey Crawford on 2/8/23. (This is a text only Order.) (JL)Clerk to Follow up
February 7, 2023 Filing 79 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Jay A. Jurata ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4790910.) by ACV Auctions, Inc..(Jaworski, Myriah)
February 2, 2023 Filing 78 STIPULATION JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS by ACV Auctions, Inc.. (Jaworski, Myriah)
January 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER denying #43 Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Hon. Geoffrey Crawford on 1/18/2023. (JLV)
December 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER granting #74 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of David M. Costigan; and granting #75 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Thomas J. Miller. Signed by Hon. Geoffrey Crawford on 12/7/22. (JL)Clerk to Follow up
December 7, 2022 Filing 75 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for Thomas J. Miller ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4742267.) by ACV Auctions, Inc..(Jaworski, Myriah)
December 7, 2022 Filing 74 MOTION to appear pro hac vice for David M. Costigan ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4742262.) by ACV Auctions, Inc..(Jaworski, Myriah)
November 28, 2022 Filing 73 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Geoffrey Crawford: Motion Hearing held on 11/28/2022 re #43 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of Georgia filed by ADESA, Inc., Independent Auto Auction Services Corporation d/b/a Independent Auction Group, ServNet Auction Group, National Auto Auction Association, Inc., Auto Auction Services Corporation, Manheim Auctions Inc., ADESA US Auction, LLC. Argument is held. Court reserves decision. Appearances: for Plaintiff - Myriah Valentina Jaworski, Esq., Julia E. Chapman, Esq.; for Defendants (ADESA US Auction, LLC) - Sean L. McGrane, Esq., Brian A Cabianca, Esq., David S. Norris, Esq.; (ADESA, Inc.) - Eva W. Cole, Esq., George E. Mastoris, Esq.; (Auto Auction Services Corporation) - Matthew D. Kent, Esq., Valarie C. Williams, Esq., Steven Lawrence Penaro, Esq.; (Independent Auto Auction Services Corporation d/b/a Independent Auction Group) - Michael Spencer Pullos, Esq.; (Manheim Auctions Inc.) - Jennifer L. Giordano, Esq., Allison Maltas, Esq.; (National Auto Auction Association, Inc.) - Noah J. Kaufman, Esq., Emily E. Renshaw, Esq.; (ServNet Auction Group) - Joseph J. Porcello, Esq. All Appearances by Zoom for Government. (JDK)
November 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER granting #66 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Valerie C. Williams; granting #68 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Julia Chapman; and granting #71 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Sean L. McGrane. Signed by Hon. Geoffrey Crawford on 11/28/22. (JL)Clerk to Follow up
November 22, 2022 Filing 71 MOTION to appear pro hac vice (Sean L. McGrane) ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4731082.) by ADESA US Auction, LLC.(Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)
November 22, 2022 Filing 70 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #68 MOTION to appear pro hac vice by Julia Chapman ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number CNYWDC-4728883.) (Notarized Affidavit and ECF Registration Form). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF Registration Form)(Jaworski, Myriah)
November 22, 2022 E-Filing Notification: #68 MOTION to appear pro hac vice by Julia Chapman. Admission Sponsoring Affidavit is not notarized and the Attorney Database and CM/ECF Registration Form was not included with application. Submit forms using Docketing Event / Continuation of Exhibits. (DDS)
November 21, 2022 Filing 69 REPLY to Response to Motion re #43 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of Georgia filed by ADESA US Auction, LLC, ADESA, Inc., Auto Auction Services Corporation, Independent Auto Auction Services Corporation d/b/a Independent Auction Group, Manheim Auctions Inc., National Auto Auction Association, Inc., ServNet Auction Group. (Penaro, Steven)
November 21, 2022 Filing 68 MOTION to appear pro hac vice by Julia Chapman ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number CNYWDC-4728883.) by ACV Auctions, Inc..(Jaworski, Myriah)
November 21, 2022 SCHEDULING NOTICE: Motion Hearing re: #43 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of Georgia is scheduled for 11/28/2022 at 1:30 PM before Hon. Geoffrey Crawford to be held remotely via Zoom for Government. The Court will send counsel a separate email link to join the conference. (JDK)
November 18, 2022 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven E Bizar on behalf of ACV Auctions, Inc. (Bizar, Steven)
November 17, 2022 Filing 66 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Valarie C. Williams ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4727785.) by Auto Auction Services Corporation.(Penaro, Steven)
November 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER granting #64 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of R. Brendan Fee. Signed by Hon. Geoffrey Crawford on 11/16/22. (JL)Clerk to Follow up
November 16, 2022 Filing 64 MOTION to appear pro hac vice by R. Brendan Fee for Defendant National Auto Auction Association, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4726162.) by National Auto Auction Association, Inc..(Renshaw, Emily)
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting #60 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Matthew D. Kent. Signed by Hon. Geoffrey Crawford on 11/15/22. (JL)Clerk to Follow up
November 15, 2022 Filing 62 DECLARATION signed by Christie Boyden re #61 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by ACV Auctions, Inc. with CORRECTED Exhibit A. (Jaworski, Myriah)
November 14, 2022 Filing 61 RESPONSE in Opposition re #43 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of Georgia filed by ACV Auctions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of C. Boyden, #2 Declaration of M. Cimato)(Jaworski, Myriah)
November 14, 2022 Filing 60 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Matthew D. Kent ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4724056.) by Auto Auction Services Corporation.(Penaro, Steven)
November 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Hon. Geoffrey Crawford on 11/14/2022. (JLV)
November 11, 2022 Filing 58 MEMORANDUM in Support re #57 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by National Auto Auction Association, Inc.. (Renshaw, Emily)
November 11, 2022 Filing 57 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by National Auto Auction Association, Inc..(Renshaw, Emily)
November 11, 2022 Filing 56 MEMORANDUM in Support re #55 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by ADESA US Auction, LLC, ADESA, Inc., Auto Auction Services Corporation, Independent Auto Auction Services Corporation d/b/a Independent Auction Group, Manheim Auctions Inc., National Auto Auction Association, Inc., ServNet Auction Group. (Penaro, Steven)
November 11, 2022 Filing 55 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by ADESA US Auction, LLC, ADESA, Inc., Auto Auction Services Corporation, Independent Auto Auction Services Corporation d/b/a Independent Auction Group, Manheim Auctions Inc., National Auto Auction Association, Inc., ServNet Auction Group.(Penaro, Steven)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting #52 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Noah J. Kaufman; and granting #53 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Mark Fanelli. Signed by Hon. Geoffrey Crawford on 11/9/22. (JL)Clerk to Follow up
November 9, 2022 Filing 53 MOTION to appear pro hac vice by Mark Fanelli for Defendant National Auto Auction Association, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4720807.) by National Auto Auction Association, Inc..(Renshaw, Emily)
November 9, 2022 Filing 52 MOTION to appear pro hac vice by Noah J. Kaufman for Auto Auction Association, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4720795.) by National Auto Auction Association, Inc..(Renshaw, Emily)
November 7, 2022 Filing 51 REPLY to Response to Motion re #47 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss filed by ADESA US Auction, LLC, ADESA, Inc., Auto Auction Services Corporation, Independent Auto Auction Services Corporation d/b/a Independent Auction Group, Manheim Auctions Inc., National Auto Auction Association, Inc., ServNet Auction Group. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Eva W. Cole in Support of Defendants' Reply to Plaintiff's Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint)(Penaro, Steven)
November 7, 2022 Filing 50 STIPULATION re #46 Stipulation and Order for Extension of Page Limits by ACV Auctions, Inc.. (Jaworski, Myriah)
November 5, 2022 Filing 49 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #47 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss and Declaration and Exhibits in Support filed by ACV Auctions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Memorandum in Opposition, #2 Exhibit A - Declaration in Support, #3 Exhibit B - Declaration in Support, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration in Support, #5 Exhibit C - Declaration in Support, #6 Exhibit E - Declaration in Support, #7 Exhibit F - Declaration in Support, #8 Exhibit G - Declaration in Support, #9 Exhibit H - Declaration in Support, #10 Exhibit I - Declaration in Support, #11 Exhibit J - Declaration in Support, #12 Exhibit K - Declaration in Support, #13 Exhibit L - Declaration in Support, #14 Exhibit M - Declaration in Support, #15 Exhibit N - Declaration in Support, #16 Exhibit O - Declaration in Support, #17 Exhibit P - Declaration in Support)(Jaworski, Myriah)
November 4, 2022 Filing 48 NOTICE of Appearance by Emily E. Renshaw on behalf of National Auto Auction Association, Inc. (Renshaw, Emily)
November 1, 2022 Filing 47 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Motion to Dismiss by ADESA US Auction, LLC, ADESA, Inc., Auto Auction Services Corporation, Independent Auto Auction Services Corporation d/b/a Independent Auction Group, Manheim Auctions Inc., National Auto Auction Association, Inc., ServNet Auction Group.(Penaro, Steven)
October 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 46 STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Time for Defendants to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint and Consolidated Briefing Schedule. Signed by Hon. Geoffrey Crawford on 10/31/2022. (JLV)
October 28, 2022 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J. Porcello on behalf of ServNet Auction Group (Porcello, Joseph)
October 28, 2022 Filing 44 MEMORANDUM in Support re #43 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of Georgia filed by ADESA US Auction, LLC, ADESA, Inc., Auto Auction Services Corporation, Independent Auto Auction Services Corporation d/b/a Independent Auction Group, Manheim Auctions Inc., National Auto Auction Association, Inc., ServNet Auction Group. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Venkat Krishnamoorthy in Support of Motion to Transfer)(Penaro, Steven)
October 28, 2022 Filing 43 MOTION to Change Venue to the Northern District of Georgia by ADESA US Auction, LLC, ADESA, Inc., Auto Auction Services Corporation, Independent Auto Auction Services Corporation d/b/a Independent Auction Group, Manheim Auctions Inc., National Auto Auction Association, Inc., ServNet Auction Group.(Penaro, Steven)
October 26, 2022 Filing 42 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer L. Giordano on behalf of Manheim Auctions Inc. (Giordano, Jennifer)
October 26, 2022 Filing 41 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Lawrence Penaro on behalf of Auto Auction Services Corporation (Penaro, Steven)
October 17, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE by ACV Auctions, Inc. Change of Law Firm (Jaworski, Myriah)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER granting #34 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of John J. Hamill; granting #35 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Michael S. Pullos; and granting #38 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Dale K. Cathell. Signed by Hon. Geoffrey Crawford on 10/13/22. (JL)Clerk to Follow up
October 12, 2022 Filing 38 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Dale K. Cathell ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4697108.) by Independent Auto Auction Services Corporation d/b/a Independent Auction Group.(Murphy, Michael)
October 12, 2022 Filing 37 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Independent Auto Auction Services Corporation d/b/a Independent Auction Group. to #35 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Michael S. Pullos ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4695452.) - Sponsoring Affidavit - filed by Independent Auto Auction Services Corporation d/b/a Independent Auction Group. (Murphy, Michael)
October 12, 2022 Filing 36 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS by Independent Auto Auction Services Corporation d/b/a Independent Auction Group. to #34 MOTION to appear pro hac vice John J. Hamill ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4695433.) - Sponsoring Affidavit - filed by Independent Auto Auction Services Corporation d/b/a Independent Auction Group. (Murphy, Michael)
October 12, 2022 E-Filing Notification: #34 MOTION to appear pro hac vice John J. Hamill #35 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Michael S. Pullos; Admission Sponsoring Affidavit is missing, please submit one for each Motion using the Continuation of Exhibits Event under the Responses and Replies tab. (JLV)
October 11, 2022 Filing 35 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Michael S. Pullos ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4695452.) by Independent Auto Auction Services Corporation d/b/a Independent Auction Group.(Murphy, Michael)
October 11, 2022 Filing 34 MOTION to appear pro hac vice John J. Hamill ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4695433.) by Independent Auto Auction Services Corporation d/b/a Independent Auction Group.(Murphy, Michael)
October 11, 2022 Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Independent Auto Auction Services Corporation d/b/a Independent Auction Group. (Murphy, Michael)
October 11, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael P. Murphy on behalf of Independent Auto Auction Services Corporation d/b/a Independent Auction Group (Murphy, Michael)
October 11, 2022 Filing 31 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Auto Auction Association, Inc.. (Graber, Timothy)
October 11, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of Appearance by Elisha D. Teibel on behalf of National Auto Auction Association, Inc. (Teibel, Elisha)
October 11, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy J. Graber on behalf of National Auto Auction Association, Inc. (Graber, Timothy)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Davis S. Norris. Signed by Hon. Geoffrey Crawford on 10/7/22. (JL)Clerk to Follow up
October 7, 2022 Filing 27 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Davis S. Norris ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4693495.) by ADESA US Auction, LLC.(Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)
October 6, 2022 Filing 26 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADESA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent KAR Auction Services, Inc., d/b/a KAR Global for ADESA, Inc... (Feher, David)
October 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Jeffrey L. Kessler; granting #23 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Eva W. Cole; and granting #24 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of George E. Mastoris. Signed by Hon. Geoffrey Crawford on 10/5/22. (JL)Clerk to Follow up
October 5, 2022 Filing 24 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of George E. Mastoris ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4691925.) by ADESA, Inc..(Feher, David)
October 5, 2022 Filing 23 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Eva W. Cole ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4691919.) by ADESA, Inc..(Feher, David)
October 5, 2022 Filing 22 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Jeffrey L. Kessler ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4691908.) by ADESA, Inc..(Feher, David)
October 3, 2022 Filing 21 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Auto Auction Services Corporation. (Penaro, Steven)
October 3, 2022 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ServNet Auction Group. (Lawrence, Brittany)
October 3, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Brittany E. Lawrence on behalf of ServNet Auction Group (Lawrence, Brittany)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #16 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Brian A. Cabianca. Signed by Hon. Geoffrey Crawford on 10/3/22. (JL)Clerk to Follow up
October 3, 2022 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Manheim Auctions Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Cox Enterprises, Inc for Manheim Auctions Inc... (Doyle, Vincent)
October 3, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to appear pro hac vice of Brian A. Cabianca ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4688509.) by ADESA US Auction, LLC.(Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)
October 3, 2022 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1(b) and/or General Order No. 157 In the Matter of Disclosure of Members, Shareholders, Partners, and Leaders of Business Organization Parties, all Corporate Disclosure Statements are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM)
September 28, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by David G. Feher on behalf of ADESA, Inc. (Feher, David)
September 28, 2022 Filing 14 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint Regarding Time for Defendants to Respond to Complaint and Consolidated Briefing Schedule by ACV Auctions, Inc.. (Jaworski, Myriah)
September 27, 2022 Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ADESA US Auction, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Carvana Operations HC, LLC, Corporate Parent Carvana Co. for ADESA US Auction, LLC.. (Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)
September 26, 2022 ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1(b) and/or General Order No. 157 In the Matter of Disclosure of Members, Shareholders, Partners, and Leaders of Business Organization Parties, all Corporate Disclosure Statements are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM)
September 21, 2022 Filing 12 STIPULATION Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to the Complaint to Allow for Consolidated Briefing Schedule by ADESA US Auction, LLC. (Ahlstrand, Elizabeth)
September 20, 2022 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Manheim Auctions, Inc. on 9/20/22, filed by ACV Auctions, Inc.. (Jaworski, Myriah)
September 16, 2022 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ACV Auctions, Inc.. ServNet Auction Group waiver sent on 8/31/2022, answer due 10/31/2022. (Jaworski, Myriah)
September 16, 2022 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ACV Auctions, Inc.. National Auto Auction Association, Inc. waiver sent on 8/31/2022, answer due 10/31/2022. (Jaworski, Myriah)
September 16, 2022 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ACV Auctions, Inc.. Auto Auction Services Corporation waiver sent on 8/31/2022, answer due 10/31/2022. (Jaworski, Myriah)
September 16, 2022 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Independent Auto Auction Services Corporation DBA Independent Auction Group on 9/6/22, filed by ACV Auctions, Inc.. (Jaworski, Myriah)
September 16, 2022 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on ADESA US Auction LLC on 9/2/22, filed by ACV Auctions, Inc.. (Jaworski, Myriah)
September 16, 2022 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on ADESA Inc. on 9/7/22, filed by ACV Auctions, Inc.. (Jaworski, Myriah)
August 29, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ADESA US Auction, LLC, ADESA, Inc., Auto Auction Services Corporation, Independent Auto Auction Services Corporation d/b/a Independent Auction Group, Manheim Auctions Inc., National Auto Auction Association, Inc., ServNet Auction Group. (JLV)
August 29, 2022 Case Assigned to Hon. Geoffrey Crawford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (JLV)
August 29, 2022 AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. (JLV)
August 29, 2022 Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (JLV)
August 26, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ACV Auctions, Inc.. (Jaworski, Myriah)
August 26, 2022 Filing 2 Original Summons Filed. (Attachments: #1 Summons 2, #2 Summons 3, #3 Summons 4, #4 Summons 5, #5 Summons 6, #6 Summons 7, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jaworski, Myriah)
August 26, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4660380, filed by ACV Auctions, Inc..(Jaworski, Myriah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ACV Auctions, Inc. v. National Auto Auction Association, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ACV Auctions, Inc.
Represented By: Myriah Valentina Jaworski
Represented By: Steven E Bizar
Represented By: Thomas J. Miller
Represented By: John A. Jurata, Jr.
Represented By: Julia E. Chapman
Represented By: David M Costigan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Auto Auction Association, Inc.
Represented By: Elisha D. Teibel
Represented By: Timothy J. Graber
Represented By: Emily E. Renshaw
Represented By: Mark Fanelli
Represented By: Noah J. Kaufman
Represented By: R. Brendan Fee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Auto Auction Services Corporation
Represented By: Matthew D Kent
Represented By: Steven Lawrence Penaro
Represented By: Valarie C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manheim Auctions Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer L. Giordano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADESA US Auction, LLC
Represented By: Brian A Cabianca
Represented By: David S. Norris
Represented By: Elizabeth F. Ahlstrand
Represented By: Sean L. McGrane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ADESA, Inc.
Represented By: David G. Feher
Represented By: Eva W. Cole
Represented By: George E. Mastoris
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Kessler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ServNet Auction Group
Represented By: Brittany E. Lawrence
Represented By: Joseph J. Porcello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Independent Auto Auction Services Corporation d/b/a Independent Auction Group
Represented By: Dale K. Cathell
Represented By: Michael Spencer Pullos
Represented By: John Joseph Hamill
Represented By: Michael P. Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?