Neubeck et al v. All America Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Kent P. Neubeck and Kemper Independence Insurance Company
Defendant: All America Insurance Company, Central Mutual Insurance Company, Paddock Chevrolet, Inc., Santino Lococo and Hanna G. Mansour
Case Number: 1:2022cv00680
Filed: September 6, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: Lawrence J Vilardo
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Letter filed by Central Mutual Insurance Company, All America Insurance Company as to Santino Lococo, Central Mutual Insurance Company, All America Insurance Company, Hanna G. Mansour, Paddock Chevrolet, Inc. . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit NOM by Kemper in state court action, #2 Exhibit Amended Answer in state court action)(Seltzer, Joshua)
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Kemper Independence Insurance Company, Kent P. Neubeck. (Kohane, Dan)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Remand to State Court amended to correct grammatical errors filed by All America Insurance Company, Central Mutual Insurance Company. (Seltzer, Joshua)
October 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by All America Insurance Company, Central Mutual Insurance Company. (Seltzer, Joshua)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AFFIRMATION re #7 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Central Mutual Insurance Company, All America Insurance Company filed by Central Mutual Insurance Company, All America Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A-E of Seltzer Affm.)(Seltzer, Joshua)
October 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by All America Insurance Company, Central Mutual Insurance Company. (Seltzer, Joshua)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST and ORDER granting request for an extension of time to respond filed by All America Insurance Company, Central Mutual Insurance Company, and Paddock Chevrolet, Inc. Response due by 10/11/2022. Reply due by 10/19/2022. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 10/3/2022. (DJ)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER re: #2 MOTION to remand to state court filed by the plaintiffs. Response due by 10/3/2022. Reply due by 10/11/2022. If necessary, the Court will schedule oral argument at a later time. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Lawrence J. Vilardo on 9/22/2022. (EK)
September 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Letter filed by Kemper Independence Insurance Company, Kent P. Neubeck as to Santino Lococo, Central Mutual Insurance Company, All America Insurance Company, Hanna G. Mansour, Paddock Chevrolet, Inc. requesting expedited resolution of motion to remand. (Kohane, Dan)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Kemper Independence Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Kemper Corporation, Corporate Parent Trinity Universal Insurance Company for Kemper Independence Insurance Company.. (Kohane, Dan)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1(b) and/or General Order No. 157 In the Matter of Disclosure of Members, Shareholders, Partners, and Leaders of Business Organization Parties, all Corporate Disclosure Statements are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Kemper Independence Insurance Company, Kent P. Neubeck. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit A - Summons & Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Paddock AOS, #4 Exhibit C - All America AOS, #5 Exhibit D - Central AOS, #6 Exhibit E - Lococo AOS, #7 Exhibit F - Mansour AOS, #8 Exhibit H - Notice of Removal, #9 Exhibit I - Kemper Policy, #10 Memorandum in Support)(Kohane, Dan)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number BUF076733. (KM)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution. NEF mailed to attorney Joshua L. Seltzer.(KM)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. NEF mailed to attorney Joshua L. Seltzer. (KM)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Central Mutual Insurance Company, All America Insurance Company, Paddock Chevrolet, Inc. from Supreme Court of the State of NY, County of Erie, case number 807746/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(KM) Modified on 9/9/2022 (KM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Neubeck et al v. All America Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent P. Neubeck
Represented By: Dan D. Kohane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kemper Independence Insurance Company
Represented By: Dan D. Kohane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All America Insurance Company
Represented By: Joshua L. Seltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Joshua L. Seltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paddock Chevrolet, Inc.
Represented By: Joshua L. Seltzer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santino Lococo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hanna G. Mansour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?