Christian et al v. Nigrelli et al
Plaintiff: John Boron, Brett Christian, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc. and Second Amendment Foundation
Defendant: Kevin P. Bruen, John J. Flynn, Steven A. Nigrelli and Everytown for Gun Safety
Case Number: 1:2022cv00695
Filed: September 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Western District of New York
Presiding Judge: John L Sinatra
Referring Judge: William M Skretny
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 DECLARATION signed by William J. Taylor, Jr. re #41 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief filed by Everytown for Gun Safety . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Proposed Amicus Brief)(Taylor, William)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT re #41 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief byEverytown for Gun Safety. (Taylor, William)
November 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by Everytown for Gun Safety.(Taylor, William)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr.: Status Conference held on 11/10/2022 re the preliminary injunction hearing. Parties advise the Court that a deposition of Mr. Christian is scheduled and, as such, live testimony at the preliminary injunction hearing is not needed. Plaintiffs' reply memorandum is forthcoming. Mr. Belka to notify the court if sur-reply is needed. Appearances. For plaintiffs: Nicolas Rotsko and John Tienken (by teleconference). For defendant Nigrelli: Ryan Belka and James Thompson (by teleconference). For defendant Flynn: Kenneth Kirby (by teleconference). (Court Reporter Bonnie Weber) (KLH)
November 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TEXT ORDER granting #38 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 11/10/22. (MEM)
November 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Brett Christian, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Second Amendment Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration in Support of Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages)(Rotsko, Nicolas)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 TEXT ORDER: The parties shall appear for a status conference on 11/10/2022 at 1:30 PM regarding the preliminary injunction hearing. Parties may appear in person or by telephone for the status conference. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 11/7/2022. (KLH)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of Appearance by James M. Thompson on behalf of Steven A. Nigrelli (Thompson, James)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #33 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Exhibits 66-78 re Parks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (s) re Public Transportation, #2 Declaration of Dr. Brennan Rivas, PhD with Exhibits A-B, #3 Declaration of David J. State, Esq.)(Belka, Ryan)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS to #33 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, Exhibit 65 re Parks. (Belka, Ryan)
November 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Steven A. Nigrelli. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan L. Belka, Esq., #2 Exhibit (s) 1-11 re Private Property, #3 Exhibit (s) 12-45 re Parks, #4 Exhibit (s) 46-64 re Parks)(Belka, Ryan)
November 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 TEXT ORDER granting #31 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 11/2/22. (MEM)
November 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Steven A. Nigrelli. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ryan L. Belka, Esq.)(Belka, Ryan)
October 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 TEXT ORDER vacating the Text Order issued at Dkt. 29. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 10/29/22. (MEM)
October 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 TEXT ORDER granting #43 motion for leave to file amicus brief. Everytown for Gun Safety may file its proposed brief (Dkt. 45-1) by 10:00 am on Monday, October 31, 2022, but may not present evidence or participate in oral arguments or any hearing. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 10/29/2022.
October 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Affidavit in Response to Plaintiffs' Motion for a Preliminary Injunction/Temporary Restraining Order filed by John J. Flynn. (Kirby, Kenneth)
October 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 PLAINTIFFS' STATUS REPORT re the TRO issued in Antonyuk v. Hochul (NDNY). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (KLH)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr.: Status Conference held on 10/3/2022 re #19 Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Court sets briefing schedule. Defendants' opposition papers due 11/4/2022. Plaintiffs' reply due 11/18/2022. Parties to appear for argument on 11/22/2022 at 2:00 PM. Defendant Bruen's deadline to file an answer or motion to dismiss is extended to 11/4/2022. Appearances. For plaintiffs: Nicolas Rotsko. For defendant Flynn: Kenneth Kirby. For defendant Bruen: Ryan Belka. (Court Reporter Bonnie Weber) (KLH)
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Lane Belka on behalf of Kevin P. Bruen (Belka, Ryan)
September 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by John Boron, Brett Christian, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Second Amendment Foundation re: Status Conference Text Order and motion papers (Rotsko, Nicolas)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand by John J. Flynn.(Kirby, Kenneth)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth R. Kirby on behalf of John J. Flynn (Kirby, Kenneth)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 TEXT ORDER granting #18 Motion Amend/Correct Case Caption and Short Title. The Clerk is directed to amend the caption in this action to be as follows: BRETT CHRISTIAN, FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC., and SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, Plaintiffs, v. KEVIN P. BRUEN, in his official capacity as Superintendent of the New York State Police, JOHN J. FLYNN, in his official capacity as District Attorney for the County of Erie, New York, Defendants. The Clerk is further directed to amend the short title in this action to be as follows: Christian, et al., v. Bruen, et al. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 9/29/2022. (KLH)
September 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 20 TEXT ORDER re #19 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The parties are ordered to appear for a status conference on October 3, 2022, at 3:30 PM for scheduling purposes. Plaintiffs are ordered to serve their motion papers and this Text Order upon Defendants in accordance with the applicable rule(s) of service such that Defendants are on notice by September 30, 2022. Plaintiffs are to file proof of service by October 3, 2022, at 12:00 PM. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 9/29/2022. (KLH)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Brett Christian, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Second Amendment Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Local Rule 65 Witness List, #3 Exhibit B - Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - Declaration of Brett Christian, #5 Exhibit D - Declaration of Brandon Combs, #6 Exhibit E - Declaration of Alan Gottlieb, #7 Exhibit F - Stickley v. City of Winchester, CL21-206 (Va Cir. Ct. Sept. 27, 2022), #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, David)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION to Amend/Correct Case Caption and Short Title by Brett Christian, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Second Amendment Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Thompson, David)
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by John Boron (Thompson, David)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Second Amendment Foundation. (Rotsko, Nicolas)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.. (Rotsko, Nicolas)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Kevin P. Bruen on 9/16/2022, filed by John Boron, Brett Christian, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Second Amendment Foundation. (Rotsko, Nicolas)
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #9 Motion to appear pro hac vice. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 9/19/22. (MEM)Clerk to Follow up
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion to appear pro hac vice. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 9/19/22. (MEM)Clerk to Follow up
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #7 MOTION to appear pro hac vice. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 9/19/22. (MEM)Clerk to Follow up
September 19, 2022 Opinion or Order ATTENTION CORPORATION PLAINTIFFS/DEFENDANTS: Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.7.1(b) and/or General Order No. 157 In the Matter of Disclosure of Members, Shareholders, Partners, and Leaders of Business Organization Parties, all Corporate Disclosure Statements are to be filed within seven (7) days of this notice. (KM)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons & Complaint served on John J. Flynn on 09/16/2022, filed by John Boron, Brett Christian, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Second Amendment Foundation. (Rotsko, Nicolas)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to appear pro hac vice John W. Tienken ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4676475.) by John Boron, Brett Christian, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Second Amendment Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Sponsoring Affidavit, #2 Petition for Pro Hac of John W. Tienken, #3 Attorny's Oath, #4 WDNY Civility Principles Oath, #5 Registration Form)(Rotsko, Nicolas)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION to appear pro hac vice David H. Thompson ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4676465.) by John Boron, Brett Christian, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Second Amendment Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Sponsoring Affidavit, #2 Petition for Pro Hac of David H. Thompson, #3 Attorny's Oath, #4 WDNY Civility Principles Oath, #5 Registration Form)(Rotsko, Nicolas)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to appear pro hac vice Peter A. Patterson ( Filing fee $ 200 receipt number ANYWDC-4676445.) by John Boron, Brett Christian, Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc., Second Amendment Foundation. (Attachments: #1 Sponsoring Affidavit, #2 Petition for Pro Hac of Peter A. Patterson, #3 Attorny's Oath, #4 WDNY Civility Principles Oath, #5 Registration Form)(Rotsko, Nicolas)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE: All parties are expected to comply with Judge Sinatra's individual requirements set forth in the "Judges' Info" section of the Court's website. Business organization parties should pay particular attention to the tab relating to such parties. (KLH)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER -- IT HEREBY IS ORDERED, that the Clerk of Court TRANSFER this case to the Honorable John L. Sinatra, Jr., United States District Judge, as a related case to 22-CV-541-JLS, over which he presides. SO ORDERED. Issued by William M. Skretny, United States District Judge on 9/15/2022. (JCM)Clerk to Follow up
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Reassigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Hon. William M. Skretny no longer assigned to the case. (TMK)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Kevin P. Bruen, John J. Flynn. (TMK)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Original Summons Filed. (Rotsko, Nicolas)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Original Summons Filed. (Rotsko, Nicolas)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 402 receipt number ANYWDC-4673461, filed by SECOND AMENDMENT FOUNDATION, John Boron, FIREARMS POLICY COALITION, INC., Brett Christian. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rotsko, Nicolas)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at #http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (TMK)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at #http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution.(TMK)
September 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Case Assigned to Hon. William M. Skretny. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (TMK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Western District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christian et al v. Nigrelli et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Boron
Represented By: Nicolas J. Rotsko
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Represented By: John W. Tienken
Represented By: Peter A Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Christian
Represented By: Nicolas J. Rotsko
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Represented By: John W. Tienken
Represented By: Peter A Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Firearms Policy Coalition, Inc.
Represented By: Nicolas J. Rotsko
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Represented By: John W. Tienken
Represented By: Peter A Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Second Amendment Foundation
Represented By: Nicolas J. Rotsko
Represented By: David H. Thompson
Represented By: John W. Tienken
Represented By: Peter A Patterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin P. Bruen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John J. Flynn
Represented By: Kenneth R. Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven A. Nigrelli
Represented By: James M. Thompson
Represented By: Ryan Lane Belka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Everytown for Gun Safety
Represented By: William James Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?